EP1914191 - Hoisting crane and offshore vessel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.2010 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Itrec B.V. Admiraal Trompstraat 2 3115 HH Schiedam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/17] | For all designated states Itrec B.V. Admiraal Trompstraat 2 3115 HH Schiedam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roodenburg, Joop 7, St. Eustatiusstraat 2612 HA Delft / NL | 02 /
Wijning, Diederick Bernardus 32, Gustav Vasaborg 3124 TH Schiedam / NL | [2008/17] | Representative(s) | Brookhuis, Hendrik Jan Arnold Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/17] | Brookhuis, Hendrik Jan Arnold Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 08075088.8 | 17.06.2005 | [2008/17] | Priority number, date | NL20041026458 | 18.06.2004 Original published format: NL 1026458 | [2008/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1914191 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1914191 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | [2008/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1914191 | Date: | 16.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B66C23/52, B66C23/84, B66D1/28, B63B35/03, F16L1/225 | [2008/17] | CPC: |
B66C23/52 (EP,US);
B66C13/06 (EP,US);
B66C23/66 (EP,US);
B66C23/84 (EP,US);
B66D1/28 (EP,US);
B66D3/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/17] | Title | German: | Hebekran und Offshore-Schiff | [2008/17] | English: | Hoisting crane and offshore vessel | [2008/17] | French: | Grue de levage et navire de haute mer | [2008/17] | Examination procedure | 05.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/41] | 04.06.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 07.08.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.08.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 06.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05753068.5 / EP1765717 | Divisional application(s) | EP09167483.8 / EP2133304 | Opposition(s) | 17.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.09.2009 | BE | 16.09.2009 | BG | 16.09.2009 | CY | 16.09.2009 | CZ | 16.09.2009 | DK | 16.09.2009 | EE | 16.09.2009 | FI | 16.09.2009 | LT | 16.09.2009 | PL | 16.09.2009 | SE | 16.09.2009 | SI | 16.09.2009 | SK | 16.09.2009 | TR | 16.09.2009 | GR | 17.12.2009 | ES | 27.12.2009 | IS | 16.01.2010 | PT | 18.01.2010 | HU | 17.03.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 16.09.2009 | |
BE | 16.09.2009 | ||
BG | 16.09.2009 | ||
CY | 16.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2009 | ||
DK | 16.09.2009 | ||
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
LT | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
SK | 16.09.2009 | ||
GR | 17.12.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
IS | 16.01.2010 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
HU | 17.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 16.09.2009 | |
BE | 16.09.2009 | ||
BG | 16.09.2009 | ||
CY | 16.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2009 | ||
DK | 16.09.2009 | ||
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
LT | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
SK | 16.09.2009 | ||
GR | 17.12.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
IS | 16.01.2010 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | AT | 16.09.2009 | |
BE | 16.09.2009 | ||
CY | 16.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2009 | ||
DK | 16.09.2009 | ||
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
LT | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
SK | 16.09.2009 | ||
GR | 17.12.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
IS | 16.01.2010 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/44] | AT | 16.09.2009 | |
BE | 16.09.2009 | ||
CY | 16.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2009 | ||
DK | 16.09.2009 | ||
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
LT | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
SK | 16.09.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
IS | 16.01.2010 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 16.09.2009 | |
BE | 16.09.2009 | ||
CY | 16.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2009 | ||
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
LT | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
SK | 16.09.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
IS | 16.01.2010 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | BE | 16.09.2009 | |
CY | 16.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2009 | ||
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
LT | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
SK | 16.09.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
IS | 16.01.2010 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | CY | 16.09.2009 | |
LT | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2025349 (KAWASAKI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1 * abstract ** figure - *; | [X]EP1063163 (GLOBAL IND LTD [US]) [X] 1-4,7-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0059] * * figure 1 * | by applicant | NL192679C |