EP2098848 - Boundary layer control system for wind tunnels [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.07.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.09.2010 [2010/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Actiflow B.V. Rotterdamseweg 145 2628 AL Delft / NL | [2009/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bink, Jeroen 131, Hooilaan 4816 EC Breda / NL | 02 /
Campe, Roy 4, Leemstraat bus 2 2320 Hoogstraten / BE | 03 /
Terry, Eric Louis Norbert 38, Lange Sint-Annastraat bus 22 2000 Antwerpen / BE | 04 /
van Dijk, Oskar Lodewijk 310, Hoefkade 2526 CG Den Haag / NL | [2009/51] |
Former [2009/37] | 01 /
Bink, Jeroen 131, Hooilaan 4816 EC Breda / NL | Representative(s) | Houben, Christiaan Hein Willem Frans Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | Houben, Christiaan Hein Willem Frans Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 08075165.4 | 04.03.2008 | [2009/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2098848 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01M9/04 | [2009/37] | CPC: |
G01M9/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/19] |
Former [2009/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Grenzschichtsteuersystem für Windkanäle | [2009/37] | English: | Boundary layer control system for wind tunnels | [2009/37] | French: | Système de contrôle de couche limite pour des souffleries | [2009/37] | Examination procedure | 10.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/35] | 15.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/35] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1752364 (ACTIFLOW B V [NL]) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0012] * * figure 3 * [Y] 5-17; | [Y]US5627312 (KRYNYTZKY ALEXANDER J [US]) [Y] 5-17 * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 5 * * column 5, line 17 - column 6, line 6 * * figures 3-5,7,8,10 *; | [A]FR2633045 (CONSERVATOIRE NAL ARTS METIERS [FR], et al) [A] 5-17 * page 5, line 17 - page 8, line 2 * * page 11, line 23 - line 27 *; | [XA]GB619250 (FREDERICK REGINALD MURRAY) [X] 1,2,5,6,11,12 * page 1, line 43 - line 62 * * page 2, line 7 - line 55 * * page 3, line 54 - line 113 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 3,4; | [XA]US3853003 (SORENSEN N) [X] 1,5,6 * the whole document * [A] 3,4; | [A]DE10037928 (MUENCH FRANZ X [DE]) [A] 10-17 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2294709 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [A] 3,4 * the whole document * | by applicant | JPH01145542 | EP1671707 | EP0515278 | JPH10221202 | JPH06213764 |