EP1944343 - Self-dispersed inks for same orifice plate systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEWLETT-PACKARD DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston, TX 77070 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston TX 77070 / US | ||
Former [2008/29] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston, TX 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rehman, Zia Ur 3305 NW Foxtail Street Corvallis OR 97330 / US | [2008/29] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 08075185.2 | 07.06.2005 | [2008/29] | Priority number, date | US20040863921 | 09.06.2004 Original published format: US 863921 | [2008/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1944343 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/00 | [2008/29] | CPC: |
B41J2/2103 (EP,US);
C09D11/324 (EP,US);
C09D11/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2008/29] | Title | German: | Selbstdispergierende Tinten für Bohrplattensysteme | [2008/29] | English: | Self-dispersed inks for same orifice plate systems | [2008/29] | French: | Encres auto-dispersées pour les mêmes systèmes de plaque d'orifice | [2008/29] | Examination procedure | 13.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/10] | 19.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/53] | 07.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/53] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05253498.9 / EP1604833 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1354921 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-5 * example -; claim - *; | [X]EP0943666 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-5 * example -; claim - *; | [PX]WO2005012446 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US], et al) [PX] 1-5 * example -; claim - *; | [X]EP1085062 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-5 * example -; claim - *; | [X]US2004059021 (OKADA MAYUKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-5 * example -; claim - *; | [X]US2002147252 (ADAMS CURTIS E [US]) [X] 1-5 * example -; claim - *; | [X]JP2002080763 (CANON KK) [X] 1-5 * abstract *; | [X]JP2004143290 (CANON KK) [X] 1-5 * abstract * | by applicant | US5707432 | US5630868 | US5571311 | US5554739 |