|
03.07.2013 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2012 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2012 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.07.2012 |
Approval of request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2012 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2012 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.06.2012 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.06.2012 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.06.2012 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.06.2012 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2012 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.06.2012 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.06.2012 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.06.2012 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2012 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2012 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.02.2012 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2012 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
13.07.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.07.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.07.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.07.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.07.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.07.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.07.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.05.2011 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2011 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.12.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.12.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.12.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.12.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.12.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.12.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.12.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.2010 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.06.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.05.2010 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2010 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2010 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.2009 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2009 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.12.2009 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.12.2009 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.11.2009 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2009 |
Request for a decision |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2009 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2009 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2008 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2008 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2008 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2008 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.06.2008 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2008 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2008 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.06.2008 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.04.2008 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2008 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.03.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
20.03.2008 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2008 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.03.2008 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2008 |
Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
04.04.2005 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
38 |