05.07.2013 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 07.08.2013 [2013/32] |
27.07.2012 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] |
04.07.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
04.07.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
19.03.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.02.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
27.01.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 29.02.2012 [2012/09] |
27.01.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 29.02.2012 [2012/09] |
12.07.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
16.05.2011 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.03.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.12.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.12.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
12.10.2010 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.09.2010 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 27.10.2010 [2010/43] |
28.05.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.05.2010 |
Deletion: Request for decision: receipt of request |
|
03.05.2010 |
Deletion: Request for decision: result |
|
03.05.2010 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
03.05.2010 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
30.04.2010 |
Deletion: Reply to examination report |
|
30.04.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
28.04.2010 |
Deletion: Reply to examination report |
|
28.04.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
18.03.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.12.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
16.12.2009 |
New entry: Request for decision: receipt of request |
|
16.12.2009 |
New entry: Request for decision: result |
|
23.09.2009 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
26.06.2009 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.03.2009 |
Change: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.03.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.02.2009 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 18.03.2009 [2009/12] |
13.02.2009 |
First examination report |
|
10.02.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.01.2009 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.02.2009 [2009/08] |
06.06.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] |
08.04.2008 |
Change: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|