EP1941841 - Tunnel notcher and guidewire delivery device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.08.2013 [2013/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DePuy Mitek, Inc. 325 Paramount Drive Raynham, MA 02767-0350 / US | [2008/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wenstrom, Richard F., Jr. 72 Sycamore Street Norwood, Massachusetts 02062 / US | 02 /
Breech, Robert K. II 3411 Onion Creek Drive Sugar Lane, Texas 77479 / US | [2008/28] | Representative(s) | Fisher, Adrian John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/35] | Fisher, Adrian John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2008/28] | Fisher, Adrian John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 08075207.4 | 04.03.2005 | [2008/28] | Priority number, date | US20040708467 | 05.03.2004 Original published format: US 708467 | [2008/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1941841 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1941841 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/16, A61B17/32, A61B17/34, A61B17/17, A61F2/08 | [2012/09] | CPC: |
A61B17/320036 (EP,US);
A61B17/1604 (EP,US);
A61B17/1635 (EP,US);
A61B17/1675 (EP,US);
A61B17/1735 (EP,US);
A61B17/1714 (EP,US);
A61B17/1764 (EP,US);
A61B17/320016 (EP,US);
A61B17/3415 (EP,US);
A61B17/8897 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00424 (EP,US);
A61B2090/062 (EP,US);
A61B2090/397 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/28] | A61B17/32, A61F2/08, A61B17/17 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/28] | Title | German: | Tunnelkerbgerät und Leitdrahtabgabevorrichtung | [2008/28] | English: | Tunnel notcher and guidewire delivery device | [2008/28] | French: | Outil pour faire des entailles dans un tunnel osseux et dispositif de pose d'un fil de guidage | [2008/28] | Examination procedure | 30.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/08] | 12.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 01.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05251329.8 / EP1570793 | Divisional application(s) | EP10178678.8 / EP2292162 | EP10178701.8 / EP2286744 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050251329) is 05.12.2006 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/32] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 01.12.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 01.12.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.05.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5374269 (ROSENBERG THOMAS D [US]) [X] 1,2,4-10,16,18-21,31,32 * figure 6 * * column 6, line 3 - column 7, line 18 * * column 10, lines 18,19,33 * [Y] 3,15; | [Y]US6123710 (PINCZEWSKI LEO A [AU], et al) [Y] 3 * figures 2,3 *; | [XY]US2002173795 (SKLAR JOSEPH H [US]) [X] 1,9-14,16,21-24,26-31 * page 4, paragraph 69 * * page 5, paragraph 87 * * figures 11,13,24,27 * * page 6, paragraph 89 * [Y] 17,33; | [Y]EP0508710 (LINVATEC CORP [US]) [Y] 15,17 * column 4, lines 30-33 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]US5643273 (CLARK RON [US]) [Y] 33 * figure 4 * |