EP1944066 - Sprayhead with nozzles made by boring [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2012 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.03.2012 [2012/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marioff Corporation Oy Hakamäenkuja 4 01510 Vantaa / FI | [2008/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sundholm, Goran Ilmari Kiannon Kuja 3 04310 Tuusula / FI | [2008/29] | Representative(s) | Slingsby, Philip Roy, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London, WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Slingsby, Philip Roy, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London, WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 08075329.6 | 22.12.2000 | [2008/29] | Priority number, date | FI19990002765 | 22.12.1999 Original published format: FI 992765 | [2008/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1944066 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1944066 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | [2009/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A62C31/02, A62C31/05, B05B1/14 | [2009/04] | CPC: |
A62C31/02 (EP,KR,US);
A62C31/05 (US);
B05B1/00 (EP,US);
B05B1/14 (EP,US);
B05B7/0416 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/29] | A62C31/02, B05B1/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2008/29] | Title | German: | Sprühkopf mit durch Bohrungen erzeugten Düsen | [2008/29] | English: | Sprayhead with nozzles made by boring | [2008/29] | French: | Tête de vaporisation avec buses fabriquées par forage | [2008/29] | Examination procedure | 07.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/46] | 01.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/13] | 08.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/13] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00987543.6 / EP1239926 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20000987543) is 04.04.2005 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 30.07.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 30.07.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.08.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2008 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   16.03.2009 | 31.12.2011 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2256729 (THOMPSON WALTER VAN E) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [X]US2414459 (JAMES FLETCHER) [X] 1-9,23-30 * column 4, line 3 - column 5, line 54; figures 2,3,7 *; | [X]US2735794 (PLETCHER CLARENCE B) [X] 1-9,12,13,23-30 * column 2, lines 39-48; figures 1-4,6,8 *; | [X]US3072344 (MCKENZIE EDWIN C) [X] 1-9,23-30 * column 3, lines 11-73; figures 1-3 *; | [X]EP0419198 (NIPPON OIL CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-11,23-30 * page 4, line 33 - page 5, line 8; figures 1-3 *; | [X]EP0598189 (BABCOCK FEUERUNGSSYSTEME [DE]) [X] 1-14,23-30 * column 2, line 38 - column 4, line 28; figures 1-4 *; | [X]EP0781961 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]) [X] 1-9,23-30 * column 3, line 4 - column 5, line 55; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | US2813753 | EP0419198 | EP0598189 | EP0781961 |