Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
27.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.09.2010 [2010/39] |
30.04.2010 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
30.04.2010 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
30.04.2010 | Definitive list of designations | published on 02.06.2010 [2010/22] |
28.08.2009 | Publication of search report | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] |
20.03.2009 | Change: Renewal fee paid | |
20.03.2009 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
29.08.2008 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] |
29.08.2008 | Request for examination filed | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] |
13.08.2008 | Change: Renewal fee paid | |
13.08.2008 | New entry: Renewal fee paid |