Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006035519 | Global Dossier | 06.04.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005JP01361 | 31.01.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8009394 | Global Dossier | 30.08.2011 | B2 | US2008165462 | 10.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005JP01361 | 31.01.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7496250 | Global Dossier | 24.02.2009 | B2 | US2007211986 | 13.09.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP0001361 | 06.03.2000 | JP2000040030 | 17.02.2000 | US94995204 | 24.09.2004 | US60237306 | 20.11.2006 | JP7221899 | 17.03.1999 | US70032301 | 27.09.2001 | US79997407 | 03.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7240541 | Global Dossier | 10.07.2007 | B2 | US2007062266 | 22.03.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP0001361 | 06.03.2000 | US94995204 | 24.09.2004 | JP2000040030 | 17.02.2000 | US60237306 | 20.11.2006 | JP7221899 | 17.03.1999 | US70032301 | 27.09.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7150185 | Global Dossier | 19.12.2006 | B2 | US2005039523 | 24.02.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP0001361 | 06.03.2000 | US94995204 | 24.09.2004 | JP2000040030 | 17.02.2000 | JP7221899 | 17.03.1999 | US70032301 | 27.09.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101143024B | Global Dossier | 08.05.2012 | B1 | KR20110050571 | 13.05.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005JP01361 | 31.01.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101117870B | Global Dossier | 27.02.2012 | B1 | KR20100039434 | 15.04.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005JP01361 | 31.01.2005 | JP2000040030 | 17.02.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100974047B | Global Dossier | 04.08.2010 | B1 | KR20070085378 | 27.08.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005JP01361 | 31.01.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4159590B | Global Dossier | 01.10.2008 | B2 | JPWO2006035519 | 15.05.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005JP01361 | 31.01.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5748797B | Global Dossier | 15.07.2015 | B2 | JP2013174613 | 05.09.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2010091731 | 12.04.2010 | JP2013097762 | 07.05.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5329470B | Global Dossier | 30.10.2013 | B2 | JP2010197400 | 09.09.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2007152754 | 08.06.2007 | WO2005JP01361 | 31.01.2005 | JP2010091731 | 12.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4630943B | Global Dossier | 09.02.2011 | B2 | JP2010078618 | 08.04.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2010002953 | 08.01.2010 | JP7221899 | 17.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4542193B | Global Dossier | 08.09.2010 | B2 | JP2009294220 | 17.12.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | JP7221899 | 17.03.1999 | JP2009206107 | 07.09.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4611436B | Global Dossier | 12.01.2011 | B2 | JP2009288252 | 10.12.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009206108 | 07.09.2009 | JP7221899 | 17.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4945727B | Global Dossier | 06.06.2012 | B2 | JP2007225625 | 06.09.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2007152754 | 08.06.2007 | JP2006537628 | 31.01.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2453246 | Global Dossier | 21.08.2013 | B1 | EP2453246 | 16.05.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP11192227 | 31.01.2005 | WO2005JP01361 | 31.01.2005 | EP05709518 | 31.01.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1855122 | Global Dossier | 28.12.2011 | B1 | EP1855122 | 09.03.2011 | A4 | EP1855122 | 14.11.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005JP01361 | 31.01.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1089066 | Global Dossier | 03.09.2008 | B1 | EP1089066 | 22.06.2005 | A4 | EP1089066 | 04.04.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP0001361 | 06.03.2000 | JP2000040030 | 17.02.2000 | JP7221899 | 17.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2005288465B | Global Dossier | 12.11.2009 | B2 | AU2005288465 | 06.04.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005JP01361 | 31.01.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1975598 | Global Dossier | 30.09.2009 | A3 | EP1975598 | 01.10.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2000040030 | 17.02.2000 | JP7221899 | 17.03.1999 | EP00906740 | 06.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE539355T | 15.01.2012 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005JP01361 | 31.01.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101120259B | 09.06.2010 | B | CN101120259 | 06.02.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005JP01361 | 31.01.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60040128D1 | 16.10.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP0001361 | 06.03.2000 | JP2000040030 | 17.02.2000 | JP7221899 | 17.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1116543 | 24.12.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005JP01361 | 31.01.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI300482B | 01.09.2008 | B | TW200702673 | 16.01.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005JP01361 | 31.01.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6834537 | 28.12.2004 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP0001361 | 06.03.2000 | JP2000040030 | 17.02.2000 | JP7221899 | 17.03.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0055597 | Global Dossier | 21.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2000040030 | 17.02.2000 | JP7221899 | 17.03.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2000329677 | Global Dossier | 30.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2000040030 | 17.02.2000 | JP7221899 | 17.03.1999 | Type | Earlier application | EP1089066 |