EP1975598 - Optical microcantilever, manufacturing method thereof, and optical microcantilever holder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.09.2010 [2010/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Instruments Inc. 8 Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 261-8507 / JP | [2008/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Niwa, Takashi Seiko Instruments Inc., 8 Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 261-8507 / JP | 02 /
Kato, Kenji Seiko Instruments Inc., 8 Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 261-8507 / JP | 03 /
Ichihara, Susumu Seiko Instruments Inc., 8 Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 261-8507 / JP | 04 /
Chiba, Norio Seiko Instruments Inc., 8 Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 261-8507 / JP | 05 /
Mitsuoka, Yasuyuki Seiko Instruments Inc., 8 Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 261-8507 / JP | 06 /
Oumi, Manabu Seiko Instruments Inc., 8 Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 261-8507 / JP | 07 /
Kasama, Nobuyuki Seiko Instruments Inc., 8 Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 261-8507 / JP | [2008/40] | Representative(s) | Cloughley, Peter Andrew, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Cloughley, Peter Andrew, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 08075627.3 | 06.03.2000 | [2008/40] | Priority number, date | JP19990072218 | 17.03.1999 Original published format: JP 7221899 | JP20000040030 | 17.02.2000 Original published format: JP 2000040030 | [2008/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1975598 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1975598 | Date: | 30.09.2009 | [2009/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01N13/14, G01B11/30, G12B21/06, G12B21/02 | [2008/40] | CPC: |
G01Q60/38 (EP,US);
B82Y20/00 (US);
B82Y35/00 (US);
G01Q60/06 (EP,US);
G01Q60/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2008/40] | Title | German: | Optischer Mikroausleger, Herstellungsverfahren für einen solchen und Mikroauslegerhalter | [2008/40] | English: | Optical microcantilever, manufacturing method thereof, and optical microcantilever holder | [2008/40] | French: | Micro-porte-au-faux optique, son procédé de fabrication et son dispositif de retenue | [2008/40] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/40] | 31.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/39] | 10.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/39] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00906740.6 / EP1089066 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE19713746 (INST MIKROTECHNIK MAINZ GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-4 * figures 1-8 * * column 4, line 60 - column 6, line 59 * [A] 5; | [A]EP0884617 (SEIKO INSTR INC [JP]) [A] 1-5 * figures 5,16-21 * * column 8, line 34 - line 52 * * column 12, line 24 - column 14, line 29 * | by applicant | JPH0717452 | - T. NIWA ET AL., JOURNAL OF MICROSCOPY, vol. 194, no. 2/3, pages 388 - 392 |