EP2017495 - Wheel suspension with damping and separation piston in the same cylinder chamber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WP Suspension B.V. Sluisweg 20 6581 KA Malden / NL | [2009/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lindeman, Eric Alexander 3, Tituslaan 6642 AP Beuningen / NL | [2009/04] | Representative(s) | Riemens, Roelof Harm Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/04] | Riemens, Roelof Harm Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 08075634.9 | 15.07.2008 | [2009/04] | Priority number, date | NL20071034169 | 20.07.2007 Original published format: NL 1034169 | [2009/04] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2017495 | Date: | 21.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2017495 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16F9/06, F16F9/18 | [2009/04] | CPC: |
F16F9/18 (EP);
F16F9/064 (EP);
F16F2230/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/04] | Title | German: | Radaufhängung mit Dämpfungs- und Trennungskolben in derselben Zylinderkammer | [2009/04] | English: | Wheel suspension with damping and separation piston in the same cylinder chamber | [2009/04] | French: | Suspension de roue avec piston d'amortisseur et de séparation dans la même chambre de cylindre | [2009/04] | Examination procedure | 17.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/35] | 21.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/19] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.06.2010 | BE | 02.06.2010 | CZ | 02.06.2010 | DK | 02.06.2010 | EE | 02.06.2010 | FI | 02.06.2010 | HR | 02.06.2010 | LT | 02.06.2010 | LV | 02.06.2010 | MT | 02.06.2010 | NL | 02.06.2010 | PL | 02.06.2010 | RO | 02.06.2010 | SI | 02.06.2010 | SK | 02.06.2010 | TR | 02.06.2010 | CY | 09.06.2010 | IE | 15.07.2010 | LU | 15.07.2010 | MC | 31.07.2010 | FR | 02.08.2010 | BG | 02.09.2010 | NO | 02.09.2010 | GR | 03.09.2010 | ES | 13.09.2010 | IS | 02.10.2010 | PT | 02.11.2010 | HU | 03.12.2010 | [2013/46] |
Former [2013/42] | AT | 02.06.2010 | |
BE | 02.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
HR | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LV | 02.06.2010 | ||
MT | 02.06.2010 | ||
NL | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
TR | 02.06.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
IE | 15.07.2010 | ||
LU | 15.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
FR | 02.08.2010 | ||
BG | 02.09.2010 | ||
NO | 02.09.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
IS | 02.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
HU | 03.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 02.06.2010 | |
BE | 02.06.2010 | ||
BG | 02.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
HR | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LV | 02.06.2010 | ||
MT | 02.06.2010 | ||
NL | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
TR | 02.06.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
IE | 15.07.2010 | ||
LU | 15.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
FR | 02.08.2010 | ||
NO | 02.09.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
IS | 02.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
HU | 03.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 02.06.2010 | |
BE | 02.06.2010 | ||
BG | 02.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
HR | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LV | 02.06.2010 | ||
MT | 02.06.2010 | ||
NL | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
IE | 15.07.2010 | ||
LU | 15.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
FR | 02.08.2010 | ||
NO | 02.09.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
IS | 02.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
HU | 03.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 02.06.2010 | |
BE | 02.06.2010 | ||
BG | 02.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
HR | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LV | 02.06.2010 | ||
MT | 02.06.2010 | ||
NL | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
IE | 15.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
FR | 02.08.2010 | ||
NO | 02.09.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
IS | 02.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
HU | 03.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 02.06.2010 | |
BE | 02.06.2010 | ||
BG | 02.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
HR | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LV | 02.06.2010 | ||
MT | 02.06.2010 | ||
NL | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
IE | 15.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
FR | 02.08.2010 | ||
NO | 02.09.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
IS | 02.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 02.06.2010 | |
BE | 02.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
HR | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LV | 02.06.2010 | ||
MT | 02.06.2010 | ||
NL | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
IE | 15.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
FR | 02.08.2010 | ||
NO | 02.09.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
IS | 02.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/34] | AT | 02.06.2010 | |
BE | 02.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
HR | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LV | 02.06.2010 | ||
NL | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
IE | 15.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
FR | 02.08.2010 | ||
NO | 02.09.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
IS | 02.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | AT | 02.06.2010 | |
BE | 02.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
HR | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LV | 02.06.2010 | ||
NL | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
FR | 02.08.2010 | ||
NO | 02.09.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
IS | 02.10.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6067209 (NHK SPRING CO LTD) [A] 1-22 * abstract *; | [A]US4807860 (SIMONS STEPHEN W [US]) [A] 1-22 * abstract *; | [A]EP0864774 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [A] 1-22* abstract *; | [A]DE19934878 (SACHS RACE ENG GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-22 * abstract *; | [DA]US6234505 (ITO NAOKI [JP]) [DA] 1-22 * abstract *; | [A]US6311962 (MARKING JOHN [US]) [A] 1-22 * abstract * | by applicant | US6234505 |