EP2027796 - Beverage making apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MARS, INCORPORATED 6885 Elm Street McLean, VA 22101-2882 / US | [2009/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hayes, Michael Andrew 4 Paddock View, Broadmoor Road Waltham St. Lawrence, Berkshire RG10 0RF / GB | 02 /
Hester, David Andrew James Cherry Cottage, Holdrop Hill, Headley Thatcham, Berkshire RG19 8LJ / GB | 03 /
Shaw, Jon William 112 Cranbourne Lane Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 ENU / GB | 04 /
Colston, Martin Eric 140 Craven Road Newbury, Berkshire RG14 5NR / GB | 05 /
Charman, Elizabeth Clare 39 Downspark Crescent, Eling Totton, Southampton SO40 9GR / GB | 06 /
Harrison, Glenn 118 Maytree Close Badger Farm, Winchester SO22 4JF / GB | 07 /
Cooke, John Charles 30 Salisbury Road Farnborough, Hampshire GU14 7AL / GB | 08 /
Wright, Michael 66 Anstey Road, Flat 2 Alton, Hampshire GU34 2RF / GB | 09 /
Hay, David 6 Weybrook Courtove, Sherbourne St. John Basingstoke, Hampshire RG24 9LG / GB | 10 /
Furneaux, Geoffrey 20 Hazelcombe, Waltham Road Overton, Hampshire RG25 3NX / GB | [2009/13] |
Former [2009/09] | 01 /
Hayes, Michael Andrew 4 Paddock View, Broadmoor Road Waltham St. Lawrence, Berkshire RG10 0RF / GB | ||
02 /
Hester, David Andrew James Cherry Cottage, Holdrop Hill, Headley Thatcham, Berkshire RG19 8LJ / GB | |||
03 /
Shaw, Jon William Ashdeane, Oakley Lane Oakley, Hampshire RG23 7JT / GB | |||
04 /
Colston, Martin Eric 140 Craven Road Newbury, Berkshire RG14 5NR / GB | |||
05 /
Charman, Elizabeth Clare 39 Downspark Crescent, Eling Totton, Southampton SO40 9GR / GB | |||
06 /
Harrison, Glenn 118 Maytree Close Badger Farm, Winchester SO22 4JF / GB | |||
07 /
Cooke, John Charles 30 Salisbury Road Farnborough, Hampshire GU14 7AL / GB | |||
08 /
Wright, Michael 66 Anstey Road, Flat 2 Alton, Hampshire GU34 2RF / GB | |||
09 /
Hay, David 6 Weybrook Courtove, Sherbourne St. John Basingstoke, Hampshire RG24 9LG / GB | |||
10 /
Furneaux, Geoffrey 20 Hazelcombe, Waltham Road Overton, Hampshire RG25 3NX / GB | Representative(s) | James, Anthony Christopher W.P., et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/09] | James, Anthony Christopher W.P., et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 08075814.7 | 26.04.2002 | [2009/09] | Priority number, date | GB20010010420 | 27.04.2001 Original published format: GB 0110420 | GB20010010421 | 27.04.2001 Original published format: GB 0110421 | GB20010022514 | 18.09.2001 Original published format: GB 0122514 | GB20010022515 | 18.09.2001 Original published format: GB 0122515 | [2009/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2027796 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2027796 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | [2009/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2027796 | Date: | 12.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/40, A47J31/06, B65D81/00, A47J31/00 | [2009/09] | CPC: |
B65D85/8043 (EP,US);
A47J31/002 (EP,US);
A47J31/401 (EP,US);
A47J31/407 (EP,US);
A47J31/4492 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2009/09] | Title | German: | Getränkeherstellungsvorrichtung- und Verfahren | [2009/09] | English: | Beverage making apparatus and method | [2009/09] | French: | Appareil et procédé de fabrication de boissons | [2009/09] | Examination procedure | 24.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/40] | 29.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02720272.0 / EP1381300 | Divisional application(s) | EP10075138.7 / EP2241229 | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.05.2010 | BE | 12.05.2010 | DK | 12.05.2010 | FI | 12.05.2010 | SE | 12.05.2010 | TR | 12.05.2010 | CY | 09.06.2010 | GR | 13.08.2010 | PT | 13.09.2010 | [2013/44] |
Former [2011/25] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
BE | 12.05.2010 | ||
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4738378 (OAKLEY PETER H [GB], et al) [A] 1-3,6 * column 2, line 41 - column 5, line 40; figures 1,3-8; claims 1-11 *; | [A]EP0756844 (JACOBS SUCHARD AG [CH]) [A] 1,4* the whole document *; | [A]EP1046366 (FIANARA INT BV [NL]) [A] 1 * column 2 - column 3 * * column 5, line 51 - column 6, line 46; figures 2,6 * | by applicant | US2977231 | US2997231 | US3622354 | EP0179641 | EP0885154 | WO9905036 | WO0158786 |