EP2071199 - Bolt protection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.07.2011 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.08.2011 [2011/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Terex Demag GmbH Dinglerstrasse 24 66482 Zweibrücken / DE | [2009/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuhn, Roland Sebastian-Kurtz-Str. 8 66386 St. Ingbert / DE | [2009/25] | Representative(s) | Meissner, Peter E., et al Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Hohenzollerndamm 89 14199 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/25] | Meissner, Peter E., et al Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Hohenzollerndamm 89 14199 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 08075873.3 | 06.11.2008 | [2009/25] | Priority number, date | DE20071060452 | 12.12.2007 Original published format: DE102007060452 | DE20072018232U | 21.12.2007 Original published format: DE 202007018232 U | [2009/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2071199 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2071199 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | [2010/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F16B21/16 | [2009/25] | CPC: |
F16B21/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2011/06] |
Former [2009/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bolzensicherung | [2009/25] | English: | Bolt protection | [2009/25] | French: | Sécurisation de boulons | [2009/25] | Examination procedure | 03.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/32] | 31.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/32] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]FR2914712 (RENAULT SAS [FR]) [XP] 1,2 * page 5 - page 9; figures 1-11 *; | [X]WO0063564 (LOCK PTY LTD T [AU], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 7, line 30 - page 10, line 5; figures 2-6 *; | [X]FR2785341 (BORGI RICHARD [FR]) [X] 1 * page 7, line 7 - page 9, line 12; figures 1-3,7 * | by applicant | DE10050143 | DE9108231U |