18.07.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] |
30.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] |
18.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] |
15.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] |
08.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] |
18.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2013 [2013/47] |
16.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.09.2013 [2013/38] |
19.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] |
12.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] |
28.06.2013 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 31.07.2013 [2013/31] |
03.05.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2013 [2013/23] |
26.04.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] |
19.04.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] |
08.03.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.04.2013 [2013/15] |
22.02.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.03.2013 [2013/13] |
15.02.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2013 [2013/12] |
08.02.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] |
01.02.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] |
25.01.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2013 [2013/09] |
18.01.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] |
09.11.2012 |
Change - representative |
published on 12.12.2012 [2012/50] |
20.07.2012 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 22.08.2012 [2012/34] |
20.07.2012 |
Change - applicant |
published on 22.08.2012 [2012/34] |
15.06.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
15.06.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
08.06.2012 |
Change - inventor |
published on 11.07.2012 [2012/28] |
22.02.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
03.02.2012 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 07.03.2012 [2012/10] |
04.01.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
23.12.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.01.2012 [2012/04] |
09.12.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.05.2011 |
Publication of search report |
published on 29.06.2011 [2011/26] |
27.05.2011 |
Change - classification |
published on 29.06.2011 [2011/26] |
06.05.2011 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
06.05.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.12.2010 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
24.04.2009 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 27.05.2009 [2009/22] |