EP2036826 - Pallet with collapsible frame and bag [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.09.2010 [2010/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MACKENZIE, Noel Gordon 35 Aberleigh Road Herston QLD 4006 / AU | [2009/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/12] | Representative(s) | Miller, James Lionel Woolverton, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/12] | Miller, James Lionel Woolverton, et al Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08075958.2 | 13.10.2006 | [2009/12] | Priority number, date | AU20050905889 | 25.10.2005 Original published format: AU 2005905889 | AU20050905888 | 25.10.2005 Original published format: AU 2005905888 | AU20060905469 | 04.10.2006 Original published format: AU 2006905469 | [2009/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2036826 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2036826 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | [2009/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B65D19/12, B65D77/06 | [2009/12] | CPC: |
B65D19/12 (EP,US);
B65D25/005 (EP,US);
B65D77/061 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00029 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00064 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00164 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00273 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00293 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00323 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00338 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00502 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00532 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00656 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00875 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00925 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/12] | Title | German: | Palette mit zusammenlegbarem Rahmen und Beutel | [2009/12] | English: | Pallet with collapsible frame and bag | [2009/12] | French: | Palette dotée d'un cadre et d'un sac pliables | [2009/12] | Examination procedure | 13.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/12] | 21.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/39] | 11.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/39] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06790378.1 / EP1945523 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE20215597U (CONTEYOR MULTIBAG SYSTEMS NV [BE]) [X] 1,4,5,14 * page 1, lines 2-7 * * page 3, lines 18-37 * * page 4, line 31 - page 8, line 3; figures 1-7.9 *; | [A]US5746343 (WALTKE DAVID L [US], et al) [A] 1-5,8-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US5622277 (VAN GIEZEN MAURICE G M [NL], et al) [A] 1-5,8-14 * the whole document *; | [A]DE20112574U (JUERGENS WALTER [DE]) [A] 11 * the whole document * | by applicant | US6974783 | US6935500 | US5884794 | US6932266 |