EP1909505 - Motion compensation method, picture coding method and picture decoding method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.04.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2008/15] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma, Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kadono, Shinya@Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd.@IP Development Center Intellectual Property Rights Operation Company 19F Matsushita IMP Building, 3-7, Shiromi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka, Osaka-shi 540-6319 / JP | 02 /
Abe, Kiyofumi@Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd.@IP Development Center Intellectual Property Rights Operation Company 19F Matsushita IMP Building, 3-7, Shiromi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka, Osaka-shi 540-6319 / JP | 03 /
Kondo, Satoshi@Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd.@IP Development Center Intellectual Property Rights Operation Company 19F Matsushita IMP Building, 3-7, Shiromi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka, Osaka-shi 540-6319 / JP | [2013/25] |
Former [2008/15] | 01 /
Kadono, Shinya Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. IP Development Center Intellectual Property Rights Operation Company 19F Matsushita IMP Building, 3-7, Shiromi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka, Osaka-shi 540-6319 / JP | ||
02 /
Abe, Kiyofumi Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. IP Development Center Intellectual Property Rights Operation Company 19F Matsushita IMP Building, 3-7, Shiromi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka, Osaka-shi 540-6319 / JP | |||
03 /
Kondo, Satoshi Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. IP Development Center Intellectual Property Rights Operation Company 19F Matsushita IMP Building, 3-7, Shiromi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka, Osaka-shi 540-6319 / JP | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/25] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | ||
Former [2008/40] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | ||
Former [2008/15] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 08100041.6 | 28.08.2003 | [2008/15] | Priority number, date | JP20020340390 | 25.11.2002 Original published format: JP 2002340390 | [2008/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1909505 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1909505 | Date: | 21.07.2010 | [2010/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1909505 | Date: | 19.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/50 | [2010/28] | CPC: |
H04N19/52 (EP,US);
H04N19/139 (BR,US);
H04N19/137 (KR,US);
H04N19/513 (BR,US);
H04N19/122 (US);
H04N19/169 (US);
H04N19/172 (US);
H04N19/176 (US);
H04N19/51 (KR,US);
H04N19/521 (US);
H04N19/557 (EP,US);
H04N19/56 (US);
H04N19/57 (US);
H04N19/577 (EP,US);
H04N19/583 (US);
|
Former IPC [2008/15] | H04N7/36 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/15] | Extension states | AL | 21.01.2011 | LT | 21.01.2011 | LV | 21.01.2011 | MK | 21.01.2011 | Title | German: | Bewegungskompensationsverfahren, Verfahren zur Bildkodierung und Verfahren zur Bilddekodierung | [2008/15] | English: | Motion compensation method, picture coding method and picture decoding method | [2008/15] | French: | Procédé de compensation du mouvement, procédé de codage d'images et procédé de décodage d'images | [2008/15] | Examination procedure | 26.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/09] | 08.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.01.2013 | 22.01.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 29.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03811870.9 / EP1569460 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030811870) is 08.10.2007 | Opposition(s) | 20.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.08.2003 | AT | 19.06.2013 | BE | 19.06.2013 | CY | 19.06.2013 | CZ | 19.06.2013 | DK | 19.06.2013 | EE | 19.06.2013 | FI | 19.06.2013 | MC | 19.06.2013 | RO | 19.06.2013 | SE | 19.06.2013 | SI | 19.06.2013 | SK | 19.06.2013 | TR | 19.06.2013 | IE | 28.08.2013 | LU | 28.08.2013 | CH | 31.08.2013 | LI | 31.08.2013 | BG | 19.09.2013 | GR | 20.09.2013 | ES | 30.09.2013 | PT | 21.10.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 19.06.2013 | |
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
MC | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
TR | 19.06.2013 | ||
IE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 19.06.2013 | |
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
MC | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
IE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 19.06.2013 | |
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
MC | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 19.06.2013 | |
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
MC | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 19.06.2013 | |
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 19.06.2013 | |
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 19.06.2013 | |
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 19.06.2013 | |
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | BE | 19.06.2013 | |
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 19.06.2013 | |
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 19.06.2013 | |
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | ES | 30.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - ALEXIS MICHAEL TOURAPIS, FENG WU, AND SHIPENG LI, "Performance comparison of Temporal and Spatial Direct mode", JOINT VIDEO TEAM (JVT) OF ISO/IEC MPEG & ITU-T VCEG(ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG16 Q.6)5TH MEETING: GENEVA, SWITZERLAND, 9-17 OCTOBER, 2002, DOCUMENT JVT-E26, (20021009), XP002585703 [I] 1-5 * the whole document * | [AD] - "H.26L TEST MODEL LONG TERM NUMBER 8 (TML-8) DRAFT0", ITU-T TELECOMMUNICATION STANDARIZATION SECTOR OF ITU, GENEVA, CH, (20010402), pages 1 - 54, XP001089814 [AD] 1-5 * paragraph [7.2.1] * | [A] - KIM D-W ET AL, "Adaptive motion estimation based on spatio-temporal correlation", SIGNAL PROCESSING. IMAGE COMMUNICATION, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (199808), vol. 13, no. 2, ISSN 0923-5965, pages 161 - 170, XP004129635 [A] 1-5 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0923-5965(98)80013-1 | [A] - CHEN M C ET AL, "Design and optimization of a differentially coded variable block size motion compensation system", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING (ICIP) LAUSANNE, SEPT. 16 - 19, 1996, NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19960916), VOL. 1, ISBN 0-7803-3259-8, pages 259 - 262, XP010202380 [A] 1-5 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIP.1996.560437 | Examination | - WINGER, "Reducing decoder peak bus bandwidth by >50%", 3. JVT MEETING; 60. MPEG MEETING; 06-05-2002 - 10-05-2002; FAIRFAX,US; (JOINT VIDEO TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, (20020510), no. JVT-C115r2-L, ISSN 0000-0442, XP030005226 | - TOURAPIS, "8x8 Block Restriction in Spatial Direct Mode", 6. JVT MEETING; 63. MPEG MEETING; 09-12-2002 - 13-12-2002; AWAJI, JP;(JOINT VIDEO TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, (20021213), no. JVT-F025, ISSN 0000-0428, XP030005595 |