|
24.04.2014 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2013 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2013 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.04.2013 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2013 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2013 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.04.2013 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.2013 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.2013 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.01.2013 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.2013 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
68 |
|
24.01.2013 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2013 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2013 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2012 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2012 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.07.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.07.2012 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.07.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.07.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.01.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.01.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.01.2012 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.01.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.01.2012 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2011 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.06.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
28.06.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.05.2011 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2011 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
62 |
|
08.03.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.03.2011 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.03.2011 |
Invitation to file a translation of the previous application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2010 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.11.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.11.2010 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.07.2010 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.07.2010 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2010 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2010 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.06.2010 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.10.2008 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2008 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2008 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.08.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2008 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2008 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2008 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2008 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2008 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.01.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
53 |
|
03.01.2008 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2008 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2008 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2008 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
03.01.2008 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.07.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
54 |