EP2077386 - Cylinder head with exhgaust manifold integrated in cylinder head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, LLC Fairlane Plaza South, Suite 800 330 Town Center Drive Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | [2009/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lenz, Ingo Suedallee 2 50858 Köln / DE | 02 /
Quiring, Stefan, Dr. Widdauener Strasse 29 51373 Leverkusen / DE | 03 /
Fritsche, Richard Buchholzen 162 42929 Wermelskirchen / DE | 04 /
Kuhlbach, Kai Am Rittersteg 60 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 05 /
Lutz, Martin Arnold-Overzier-Strasse 4 50678 Köln / DE | [2009/28] | Representative(s) | Illing, Rolf, et al Ford-Werke GmbH Patentabteilung NH-364 Henry-Ford-Straße 1 50735 Köln / DE | [2016/39] |
Former [2009/28] | Drömer, Hans-Carsten Henry-Ford Str. 1 50725 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 08100145.5 | 07.01.2008 | [2009/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2077386 | Date: | 08.07.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2077386 | Date: | 28.09.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F02M26/14 | [2016/27] | CPC: |
F02F1/4264 (EP);
F02F1/243 (EP);
F02M26/14 (EP);
F02M26/30 (EP);
F02F2001/4278 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/28] | F02F1/42, F02M25/07 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, RO, TR [2016/39] |
Former [2010/11] | DE, FR, GB, RO, TR | ||
Former [2009/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Zylinderkopf mit im Zylinderkopf integriertem Abgaskrümmer | [2009/28] | English: | Cylinder head with exhgaust manifold integrated in cylinder head | [2009/28] | French: | Culasse dotée d'un collecteur de gaz d'échappement intégré dans la culasse | [2009/28] | Examination procedure | 10.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/07] | 09.01.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.02.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, SE, SI, SK | 15.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1006272 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-3,6-8,9,10 * paragraphs [0013] , [0025] , [0049] , [0052]; figures 2,5,7,10,13 *; | [YD]US2002043254 (IIZUKA YOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [YD] 1-3,6-8 * paragraphs [0005] , [0025] - [0027]; figure 2 *; | [Y]WO2005047669 (MACK TRUCKS [US], et al) [Y] 9,10 * paragraphs [0006] , [0015]; figure 2 *; | [A]US2002179044 (IIZUKA YOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0076] , [0077]; figures 3,10 * | by applicant | EP1722090 | GB2370073 | EP20070110193 |