EP2077296 - Extrusion Coating Polyethylene Composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.2011 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Borealis Technology OY P.O.Box 330 06101 Porvoo / FI | [2009/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nummila-Pakarinen, Auli Roviovuorenkatu 12 06100, Porvoo / FI | 02 /
Sainio, Markku Myrskyläntie 696 06100, Porvoo / FI | 03 /
Laiho, Erkki Sauvontie 4 A 2 00280, Helsinki / FI | [2009/28] | Representative(s) | Lux, Berthold, et al Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/34] | Lux, Berthold, et al Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/28] | Lindinger, Ingrid Borealis Polyolefine GmbH St.-Peter-Straße 25 4021 Linz / AT | Application number, filing date | 08100152.1 | 07.01.2008 | [2009/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2077296 | Date: | 08.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2077296 | Date: | 20.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/06, C08L23/08, C09D123/06, C09D123/08 | [2009/28] | CPC: |
C09D123/0815 (EP);
C08L23/06 (EP);
C08L23/0815 (EP);
C09D123/06 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L23/06, C08L2666/06 (EP);
C08L23/0815, C08L2666/06 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/28] | Title | German: | Extrusionsbeschichtung einer Polyethylenzusammensetzung | [2009/28] | English: | Extrusion Coating Polyethylene Composition | [2009/28] | French: | Composition de polyéthylène de revêtement par extrusion | [2009/28] | Examination procedure | 07.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/03] | 02.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 21.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.10.2010 | BE | 20.10.2010 | CY | 20.10.2010 | CZ | 20.10.2010 | DK | 20.10.2010 | EE | 20.10.2010 | HR | 20.10.2010 | HU | 20.10.2010 | LT | 20.10.2010 | LV | 20.10.2010 | MT | 20.10.2010 | NL | 20.10.2010 | PL | 20.10.2010 | RO | 20.10.2010 | SI | 20.10.2010 | SK | 20.10.2010 | TR | 20.10.2010 | IE | 07.01.2011 | LU | 07.01.2011 | BG | 20.01.2011 | NO | 20.01.2011 | GR | 21.01.2011 | ES | 31.01.2011 | MC | 31.01.2011 | IS | 20.02.2011 | PT | 21.02.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
CY | 20.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2010 | ||
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
HR | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LV | 20.10.2010 | ||
MT | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
PL | 20.10.2010 | ||
RO | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SK | 20.10.2010 | ||
TR | 20.10.2010 | ||
IE | 07.01.2011 | ||
LU | 07.01.2011 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
NO | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
Former [2013/26] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
CY | 20.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2010 | ||
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
HR | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LV | 20.10.2010 | ||
MT | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
PL | 20.10.2010 | ||
RO | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SK | 20.10.2010 | ||
IE | 07.01.2011 | ||
LU | 07.01.2011 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
NO | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2010 | ||
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
HR | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LV | 20.10.2010 | ||
MT | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
PL | 20.10.2010 | ||
RO | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SK | 20.10.2010 | ||
IE | 07.01.2011 | ||
LU | 07.01.2011 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
NO | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2010 | ||
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
HR | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LV | 20.10.2010 | ||
MT | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
PL | 20.10.2010 | ||
RO | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SK | 20.10.2010 | ||
IE | 07.01.2011 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
NO | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2010 | ||
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
HR | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LV | 20.10.2010 | ||
MT | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
PL | 20.10.2010 | ||
RO | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SK | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
NO | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2010 | ||
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
HR | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LV | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
PL | 20.10.2010 | ||
RO | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SK | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
NO | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
HR | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LV | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
NO | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/34] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
HR | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LV | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
NO | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
HR | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LV | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
NO | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [DXY]WO2005002744 (BOREALIS TECH OY [FI], et al) [DX] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 1-14; | [A]EP1555292 (BOREALIS TECH OY [FI]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]EP1591475 (BOREALIS TECH OY [FI]) [A] 1-14* abstract *; | [X]EP1674490 (BOREALIS TECH OY [FI]) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * page 7 *; | [DXY]EP1777238 (BOREALIS TECH OY [FI]) [DX] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 1-14 | by applicant | EP0887379 | WO9924478 | WO9924479 | WO0022040 | WO0068315 | WO2004000899 | WO2004111095 | WO2005002744 | EP1674490 | WO2006074694 | EP1777238 | - SCHLEY; SCHWARZ, Polyolefine, CARL HANSER VERLAG, (1969), vol. IV, pages 39 - 51 | - HEINO, E.L.; LEHTINEN, A.; TANNER J.; SEPPäLä, J., "Rheological characterization of polyethylene fractions", THEOR. APPL. RHEOL., PROC. INT. CONGR. RHEOL, (1992), vol. 1, pages 360 - 362, XP008137571 |