EP1981318 - Function unit for an optoelectronic sensor and method for fixing a circuit board [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.09.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SICK AG Erwin-Sick-Strasse 1 79183 Waldkirch / DE | [2008/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hug, Gottfried Am Wegle 1a 79183 Waldkirch / DE | 02 /
Borchardt, Martin Moltkestrasse 23 79183 Waldkirch / DE | [2008/42] | Representative(s) | Hehl, Ulrich SICK AG Intellectual Property Erwin-Sick-Strasse 1 79183 Waldkirch / DE | [2008/42] | Application number, filing date | 08100185.1 | 08.01.2008 | [2008/42] | Priority number, date | DE20071017917 | 13.04.2007 Original published format: DE102007017917 | [2008/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1981318 | Date: | 15.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H05K1/14, G01D11/24 | [2008/42] | CPC: |
H05K1/148 (EP);
G01D11/245 (EP);
H05K2201/10121 (EP);
H05K2201/10151 (EP);
H05K2201/10598 (EP);
H05K3/4691 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/26] |
Former [2008/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Funktionseinheit für einen optoelektronischen Sensor und Verfahren zur Anbringung einer Leiterplatte | [2008/42] | English: | Function unit for an optoelectronic sensor and method for fixing a circuit board | [2008/42] | French: | Unité de fonction pour un capteur optoélectronique et procédé d'application d'une plaquette | [2008/42] | Examination procedure | 16.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/43] | 03.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/43] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1429164 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [X] 1-19 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0040] * * figure 1B *; | [A]DE19720106 (TELEFUNKEN MICROELECTRON [DE]) [A] 1-19 * column 1, line 16 - line 21 * * column 3, line 29 - line 31 * * figure 2 *; | [A]US2006257081 (ISHIGAMI YOSHIAKI [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-19 * paragraph [0074]; figure 4C *; | [A]DE19820358 (LEUZE ELECTRONIC GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-19 * column 2, line 38 - line 65; figure 1 * |