EP1944279 - Use of photocatalytic preparations of colloidal titanium dioxide for preserving the original appearance of cementitious, stone, or marble products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.08.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ITALCEMENTI S.p.A. Via G. Camozzi, 124 24121 Bergamo / IT | [2008/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMADELLI, Rossano Via Massarenti, 39 Fraz. Gualdo 44019 VOGHIERA / IT | 02 /
CASSAR, Luigi Via Europa 42 20097 SAN DONATO MILANESE / IT | 03 /
PEPE, Carmine Via Casnidelli 12 24010 PONTERANICA / IT | [2008/29] | Representative(s) | Gerli, Paolo, et al Notarbartolo & Gervisi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Gerli, Paolo, et al Notarbartolo & Gervisi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2008/29] | Gerli, Paolo, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 08100350.1 | 21.06.2000 | [2008/29] | Priority number, date | IT1999MI01422 | 25.06.1999 Original published format: IT MI991422 | [2008/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1944279 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1944279 | Date: | 10.09.2008 | [2008/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C04B41/50, C01G23/053 | [2008/29] | CPC: |
C03C17/007 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C01G23/047 (EP,US);
C01G23/053 (EP,US);
C04B41/009 (EP,US);
C04B41/5041 (EP,US);
C04B41/65 (EP,US);
C01P2004/64 (EP,US);
C03C2217/212 (EP,US);
C03C2217/218 (EP,US);
C03C2217/228 (EP,US);
C03C2217/23 (EP,US);
C03C2217/24 (EP,US);
C03C2217/242 (EP,US);
C03C2217/42 (EP,US);
C04B2111/2061 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C04B41/009, C04B14/00 (US,EP);
C04B41/009, C04B14/285 (US,EP);
C04B41/009, C04B28/02 (US,EP);
C04B41/5041, C04B41/4539, C04B41/4554, C04B41/5045 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | [2009/20] |
Former [2008/29] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verwendung photokatalytischer Titandioxidpräparate in Kolloidform zur Bewahrung der ursprünglichen Erscheinungsform von Zement-, Stein- oder Marmorprodukten | [2008/29] | English: | Use of photocatalytic preparations of colloidal titanium dioxide for preserving the original appearance of cementitious, stone, or marble products | [2008/29] | French: | Utilisation de préparations photocatalytiques de dioxyde de titane colloïdal pour la conservation de l'aspect original de produits de ciment, de pierre ou de marbre | [2008/29] | Examination procedure | 11.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/37] | 21.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/37] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00945794.6 / EP1196359 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH1149588 ; | [X]EP0590477 (TAKENAKA CORP [JP]) [X] 1-62 * claim - *; | [X]WO9710186 (SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE [FR], et al) [X] 1-62 * claim 21 * * page 4, paragraph 3 *; | [X]US5698205 (BRUECKNER HANS-DIETE [DE], et al) [X] 52-62 * example 1 *; | [A]WO9805601 (ITALCEMENTI SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1-62 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2753980 (RHONE POULENC CHIMIE [FR]) [X] 1-62 * claim - * * example - * * page 1, line 34 - page 2, line 26 * * page 3, line 1 - line 3 * * page 3, line 12 - page 4, line 10 * * page 7, line 1 - page 8, line 23 * * page 10, line 21 - line 24 * * page 17, line 12 - page 18, line 14 *; | [A]US5759251 (NAKAMURA MITSURU [JP], et al) [A] 1-62* the whole document *; | [X]EP0924164 (HOYA CORP [JP]) [X] 1-62 * example 10 *; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990531), vol. 1999, no. 05, & JP11049588 A 19990223 (KAWAI MUSICAL INSTR MFG CO LTD) [X] 1-62 * abstract * | [XA] - SERPONE N ET AL, "Spectroscopic, photoconductivity, and photocatalytic studies of TiO2 colloids. Naked and with the lattice doped with Cr<3+>, Fe<3+>, and V<5+> cations", LANGMUIR; LANGMUIR MAR 1994, (199403), vol. 10, no. 3, pages 643 - 652, XP002489443 [X] 52-62 * abstract * * page 644, column L * [A] 1-51 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/la00015a010 | [XA] - V. BREZOVA ET AL, "Phenol decomposition using M n+/TiO2 photocatalysts supported by the sol-gel technique on glass fibres", JOURNAL OF PHOTOCHEMISTRY AND PHOTOBIOLOGY A: CHEMISTRY, (1997), vol. 109, pages 177 - 183, XP002489444 [X] 52-62 * abstract * * page 178, column L * * page 180, column R * [A] 1-61 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1010-6030(97)00121-4 |