EP1954105 - Method and system of data transfer for operational devices for illuminants [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.04.2015 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2015 | Refusal of application | published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tridonic GmbH & Co KG Färbergasse 15 6851 Dornbirn / AT | [2010/38] |
Former [2008/32] | For all designated states TridonicAtco GmbH & Co. KG Färbergasse 15 6851 Dornbirn / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rudigier, Martin Oberhaus 507 6555 Kappl / AT | [2008/32] | Representative(s) | Rupp, Christian, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Rupp, Christian, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08100407.9 | 14.01.2008 | [2008/32] | Priority number, date | DE20071004397 | 29.01.2007 Original published format: DE102007004397 | [2008/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1954105 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H05B37/02, H02J13/00 | [2008/32] | CPC: |
H05B47/18 (EP);
H05B47/105 (EP);
H05B47/13 (EP);
Y02B20/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/32] | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Datenübertragung bei Betriebsgeräten für Leuchtmittel | [2008/32] | English: | Method and system of data transfer for operational devices for illuminants | [2008/32] | French: | Procédé et système de transmission de données dans des appareils de fonctionnement pour moyens d'éclairage | [2008/32] | Examination procedure | 12.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/10] | 24.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2014 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/22] | 20.11.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.01.2015 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 08.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2015/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.09.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003222603 (MOGILNER RAFAEL [IL], et al) [X] 1-5,13-19 * paragraph [0067]; figure 8a *; | [XY]EP0415662 (TEKNOWARE OY [FI]) [X] 1-5,13-19 * abstract * [Y] 10,11; | [AY]WO03094579 (ENVIRONMENTAL MAN LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-4,9,13-17,19 * abstract * [Y] 8-12; | [Y]GB2404474 (COOPER LIGHTING AND SECURITY L [GB]) [Y] 8-12 * page 11, line 17 - line 19 *; | [Y]EP1619935 (PATENT TREUHAND GES FUER ELEKTRISCHE GLUEHLAMPEN MBH [DE]) [Y] 8-12 * paragraphs [0013] , [0014] , [0016] , [0041] *; | [A]US2004217718 (KUMAR RUSSIKESH [US], et al) [A] 1-7,13-19 * paragraph [0051]; figure 4b *; | [A]GB2365231 (MANS PAUL [GB]) [A] 1-7,13-19 * abstract *; | [A]WO2007009896 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-19 * page 2, column 27 - column 30 *; | [A]EP1071054 (HUBBELL INC [US]) [A] 1-7,13-19 * abstract *; | [A]US2005179404 (VESKOVIC DRAGAN [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * figure 2 * | [X] - ONLITE EMERGENCY LIGHTING, (20040331), XP002351214 [X] 8-11 * page 24 * | [Y] - ALONSO J M ET AL, "A smart-lighting emergency ballast for fluorescent lamps based on microcontroller", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL APPLIED POWER ELECTRONICS CONFERENCE AND EXPOSITION (APEC). SAN DIEGO, MAR. 7 - 11, 1993, NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19930307), vol. CONF. 8, ISBN 0-7803-0983-9, pages 549 - 555, XP010111283 [Y] 8-12 * paragraph [000I] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/APEC.1993.290717 |