Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
05.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.03.2010 [2010/10] |
09.10.2009 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
10.07.2009 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
27.02.2009 | Definitive list of designations | published on 01.04.2009 [2009/14] |
27.02.2009 | First examination report | |
25.02.2009 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
30.01.2009 | Request for examination filed | published on 04.03.2009 [2009/10] |
20.06.2008 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] |