EP1953169 - Production of propoxylated products containing phosphorous through use of aluminium trichloride [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 11.01.2013 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LANXESS Deutschland GmbH 51369 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | For all designated states LANXESS Deutschland GmbH 51369 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weiss, Thomas Pfarrstr. 28 68549 IIvesheim / DE | 02 /
Elbert, Rainer Hufer-Weg 40 51469, Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/32] | 01 /
WEIß, Thomas Pfarrstr. 28 68549 IIvesheim / DE | ||
02 /
ELBERT, Rainer Hufer-Weg 40 51469, Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 08100618.1 | 18.01.2008 | [2008/32] | Priority number, date | DE20071005273 | 02.02.2007 Original published format: DE102007005273 | DE20071006494 | 09.02.2007 Original published format: DE102007006494 | [2008/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1953169 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1953169 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | [2009/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1953169 | Date: | 22.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/09 | [2008/32] | CPC: |
C07F9/091 (EP,US);
C08K5/521 (EP,US);
C09K21/12 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/521, C08L75/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/32] | Title | German: | Herstellung von phosphorhaltigen Propoxylierungsprodukten durch Verwendung von Aluminiumtrichlorid | [2008/32] | English: | Production of propoxylated products containing phosphorous through use of aluminium trichloride | [2008/32] | French: | Fabrication de produits de propoxylation contenant du phosphore en utilisant du trichlorure d'aluminium | [2008/32] | Examination procedure | 18.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/39] | 29.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP09176233.6 / EP2174943 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.06.2011
08.07.2011
ADMISSIBLE ICL-IP Bitterfeld GmbH Postfach 1210 06732 Bitterfeld-Wolfen / DE Opponent's representative De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2011/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.06.2011
ICL-IP Bitterfeld GmbH Postfach 1210 06732 Bitterfeld-Wolfen / DE Opponent's representative De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 NL-1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | 03.08.2011 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.02.2012 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 29.09.2012 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2013/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 22.09.2010 | CZ | 22.09.2010 | DK | 22.09.2010 | EE | 22.09.2010 | FI | 22.09.2010 | HR | 22.09.2010 | HU | 22.09.2010 | IE | 22.09.2010 | LT | 22.09.2010 | LV | 22.09.2010 | MT | 22.09.2010 | RO | 22.09.2010 | SE | 22.09.2010 | SI | 22.09.2010 | SK | 22.09.2010 | TR | 22.09.2010 | BG | 22.12.2010 | NO | 22.12.2010 | GR | 23.12.2010 | LU | 18.01.2011 | IS | 22.01.2011 | PT | 24.01.2011 | MC | 31.01.2011 | CH | 31.01.2012 | LI | 31.01.2012 | [2022/27] |
Former [2020/21] | CY | 22.09.2010 | |
CZ | 22.09.2010 | ||
DK | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
HR | 22.09.2010 | ||
HU | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
MT | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
BG | 22.12.2010 | ||
NO | 22.12.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
LU | 18.01.2011 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | CZ | 22.09.2010 | |
DK | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
HR | 22.09.2010 | ||
HU | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
MT | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
BG | 22.12.2010 | ||
NO | 22.12.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
LU | 18.01.2011 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CZ | 22.09.2010 | |
DK | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
HR | 22.09.2010 | ||
HU | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
MT | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
BG | 22.12.2010 | ||
NO | 22.12.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/42] | CZ | 22.09.2010 | |
DK | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
HR | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
MT | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
BG | 22.12.2010 | ||
NO | 22.12.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2011/27] | CZ | 22.09.2010 | |
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
HR | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
NO | 22.12.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US2610978 (LANHAM WILLIAM M) [DA] 1-5,8,9 * column 2, paragraph 1 * * column 1, line 10 - line 11 * * column 1, line 12 - line 15 * [A] 7,6,10,11; | [X]EP1702923 (LANXESS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [X] 6,7 * claim 5 * * paragraph [0001] *; | [DA] - GUTMANN V., "Verbindungen des Phosphoroxychlorids und das Verhalten ihrer Lösungen", Z.ANORG. ALLG. CHEM., (1952), no. 269, pages 279 - 291, XP002507678 [DA] 1-5,8,9 * page 279 - page 282; tables 1-3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/zaac.19522690416 | [A] - BOGHOSIAN, S. ET AL, "Characterization of vapor complexes over molten phosphoryl chloride-aluminum or gallium chloride mixtures: Raman spectra and thermodynamics", POLYHEDRON , 12(7), 771-82 CODEN: PLYHDE; ISSN: 0277-5387, (1993), XP002507679 [A] 1-5,8,9 * page 773, column 1 - page 776, column 1; table 1 * | by applicant | US2610978 | US3100220 | DE1921504 | DD125035 | EP0398095 | - HOUBEN-WEYL, BD., METHODEN DER ORGANISCHEN CHEMIE, vol. 12, no. 2, pages S. 336 - 339 | - Z. ANORG. ALLG. CHEM., (1952), vol. 269, page 279 |