EP1950117 - Train set for a fast train [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | For all designated states Offene Aktiengesellschaft "Russische Eisenbahnen" Novaya Basmannaya Str. 2 107144 Moskau / RU | [2013/11] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
For all designated states Offene Aktiengesellschaft "Russische Eisenbahnen" Novaya Basmannaya Str. 2 107144 Moskau / RU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lipp, Andreas Sägersäcker 27 91056, Erlangen / DE | 02 /
Andreev, Vladimir Evgenevich Leninskij pr. Strasse 159 Wohnung 37 196066, St. Petersburg / RU | 03 /
Nazarov, Aleksander Stanislavovich Geb. 1, Wohnung 155 Kosmonavt Volkov Str. 29 129277, Moskau / RU | 04 /
Nazarov, Oleg Nikolaevich Geb. 2, Wohnung 547 Borisovskie Prudy Str. 20 115612, Moskau / RU | [2013/32] |
Former [2013/12] | 01 /
Lipp, Andreas Sägersäcker 27 91056, Erlangen / DE | ||
02 /
Gapanovich, Valentin Aleksandrovich Wohnung 20 Osennij Bulvar 17 121609, Moskau / RU | |||
03 /
Yagovkin, Andrej Nikolaevich Wohnung 69 Nata Babushkina 140121, Ramenskij Rajon, llinskij / RU | |||
04 /
Andreev, Vladimir Evgenevich Leninskij pr. Strasse 159 Wohnung 37 196066, St. Petersburg / RU | |||
05 /
Nazarov, Aleksander Stanislavovich Geb. 1, Wohnung 155 Kosmonavt Volkov Str. 29 129277, Moskau / RU | |||
06 /
Nazarov, Oleg Nikolaevich Geb. 2, Wohnung 547 Borisovskie Prudy Str. 20 115612, Moskau / RU | |||
Former [2008/31] | 01 /
Lipp, Andreas Sägersäcker 27 91056, Erlangen / DE | ||
02 /
Gapanovich, Valentin Aleksandrovich Wohnung 20 Osennij Bulvar 17 121609, Moskau / RU | |||
03 /
Yagovkin, Andrej Nikolaevich Wohnung 69 Nata Babushkina 140121, Ramenskij Rajon, llinskij / RU | |||
04 /
Andreev, Vladimir Evgenevich Leninskij pr. Strasse 159 Wohnung 37 196066, St. Petersburg / RU | |||
05 /
Nazarov, Aleksander Stanislavovich Geb. 1, Wohnung 155 Kosmonavt Volkov Str. 29 129277, Moskau / RU | |||
06 /
Nazarov, Oleg Nikolaevich Geb. 2, Wohnung 547 Borisovskie Prudy Str. 20 115612, Moskau / RU | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/12] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2009/33] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2008/31] | Siegler, Frank Siemens AG CT IP Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08100919.3 | 25.01.2008 | [2008/31] | Priority number, date | RU20070103118U | 26.01.2007 Original published format: R U 2007103118 U | [2008/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1950117 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1950117 | Date: | 20.03.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B61C3/02 | [2008/31] | CPC: |
B61C3/02 (EP,US);
B60L5/18 (EP);
B60L9/00 (EP);
B60L9/005 (EP);
B60L2200/26 (EP);
Y02T30/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/31] | Title | German: | Zugverband für einen Schnellzug | [2008/31] | English: | Train set for a fast train | [2008/31] | French: | Rame pour train rapide | [2008/31] | Examination procedure | 18.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/07] | 12.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.05.2009 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.01.2008 | CY | 20.03.2013 | CZ | 20.03.2013 | DK | 20.03.2013 | EE | 20.03.2013 | FI | 20.03.2013 | HR | 20.03.2013 | LT | 20.03.2013 | LV | 20.03.2013 | MC | 20.03.2013 | MT | 20.03.2013 | PL | 20.03.2013 | RO | 20.03.2013 | SI | 20.03.2013 | SK | 20.03.2013 | BG | 20.06.2013 | NO | 20.06.2013 | GR | 21.06.2013 | IS | 20.07.2013 | [2016/32] |
Former [2016/12] | CY | 20.03.2013 | |
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
MT | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/38] | CY | 20.03.2013 | |
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 20.03.2013 | |
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 20.03.2013 | |
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | CZ | 20.03.2013 | |
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | CZ | 20.03.2013 | |
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | EE | 20.03.2013 | |
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | FI | 20.03.2013 | |
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | FI | 20.03.2013 | |
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 20.03.2013 | |
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 20.03.2013 | |
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 20.03.2013 | |
NO | 20.06.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1126573 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1-7 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0023] *; | [A]EP1052136 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0015] *; | [A]DE19819094 (ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH]) [A] 1-7 * abstract * | [Y] - KURZ H, "ICE3 TEST TRAIN ROLLS THIS SUMMER", RAILWAY GAZETTE INTERNATIONAL, REED BUSINESS INFORMATION, LONDON, GB, (19970601), vol. 153, no. 6, ISSN 0373-5346, pages 373 - 376, XP000689173 [Y] 1-7 * the whole document * | by applicant | - EISENBAHNEN DER WELT, (1997), no. 12, pages 3 - 17 |