EP2085696 - Burner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.01.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.02.2010 [2010/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [2009/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De Jong, Johannes Cornelis Badhuisweg 3 1031 CM Amsterdam / NL | [2009/32] | Representative(s) | Matthezing, Robert Maarten, et al Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2010/07] | Matthezing, Robert Maarten, et al Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | ||
Former [2009/32] | Zeestraten, Albertus W. J. Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 08101177.7 | 31.01.2008 | [2009/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2085696 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F23D14/22, F23D14/64, F23D14/70, F23N5/12, F23Q3/00 | [2009/32] | CPC: |
F23D14/22 (EP);
F23D14/64 (EP);
F23D14/70 (EP);
F23N5/12 (EP);
F23Q3/00 (EP);
F23D2900/14004 (EP);
F23D2900/14642 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Brenner | [2009/32] | English: | Burner | [2009/32] | French: | Brûleur | [2009/32] | Examination procedure | 15.01.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1783426 (RIELLO SPA [IT]) [X] 1,2,4,7 * column 2, line 4 - column 3, line 50; figures 1,2 * [Y] 3; | [Y]DE10144472 (GASWAERME INST E V [DE]) [Y] 3 * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 23; figure 1 *; | [X]US5551869 (BRAIS NORMAND [CA], et al) [X] 1,4,5 * column 3, line 5 - line 50 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE102006005386 (UHDE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,4,7 * page 3, paragraph 13 - paragraph 16; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | WO9603345 |