06.03.2020 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
29.03.2019 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 01.05.2019 [2019/18] |
26.03.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
25.03.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
25.03.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
16.02.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.11.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.11.2018 |
Change - inventor |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
23.11.2018 |
Change - German title |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
23.11.2018 |
Change - English title |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
23.11.2018 |
Change - French title |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
12.10.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
12.10.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
29.09.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
30.06.2018 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.04.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.03.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
17.02.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.01.2018 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.09.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.02.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.01.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.07.2015 |
Change - applicant |
published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] |
17.01.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.01.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.02.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.12.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.02.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.06.2010 |
Change - applicant |
published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] |
28.01.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.07.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
10.07.2009 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
27.03.2009 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 29.04.2009 [2009/18] |
27.03.2009 |
First examination report |
|
24.03.2009 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
20.03.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.02.2009 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 01.04.2009 [2009/14] |
18.07.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] |