EP2091029 - Hazard recognition utilising a temperature measurement device integrated in a microcontroller [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2024 | New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Schweiz AG Freilagerstrasse 40 8047 Zürich / CH | [2015/04] |
Former [2013/11] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/34] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fischer, Martin Kasernenstrasse 126 8180 Bülach / CH | 02 /
Aebersold, Hans Bucheneggstrasse 10 8906 Bonstetten / CH | [2009/34] | Representative(s) | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/42] | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08101643.8 | 15.02.2008 | [2009/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2091029 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2091029 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G08B17/06, G08B17/107, G08B29/18, G08B29/24, G08B17/113 | [2020/01] | CPC: |
G08B17/06 (EP);
G08B17/107 (EP);
G08B17/113 (EP);
G08B29/24 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/34] | G08B17/06, G08B17/107, G08B29/18, G08B29/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/47] |
Former [2009/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Gefahrenerkennung mit Einbezug einer in einem Mikrocontroller integrierten Temperaturmesseinrichtung | [2009/34] | English: | Hazard recognition utilising a temperature measurement device integrated in a microcontroller | [2009/34] | French: | Détection de danger incluant un dispositif de mesure de température intégré dans un microcontrôleur | [2009/34] | Examination procedure | 08.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/11] | 10.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
29.09.2011
06.10.2011
ADMISSIBLE HEKATRON Vertriebs GmbH Brühlmatten 9 79295 Sulzburg / DE Opponent's representative Börjes-Pestalozza, Henrich Maucher Jenkins Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Urachstraße 23 79102 Freiburg im Breisgau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.09.2011
06.10.2011
ADMISSIBLE HEKATRON Vertriebs GmbH Brühlmatten 9 79295 Sulzburg / DE Opponent's representative Börjes-Pestalozza, Heinrich Maucher Börjes Jenkins Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Urachstraße 23 79102 Freiburg im Breisgau / DE | ||
Former [2011/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.09.2011
HEKATRON Vertriebs GmbH Brühlmatten 9 79295 Sulzburg / DE Opponent's representative Maucher, Wolfgang Maucher, Börjes & Kollegen Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät Urachstraße 23 D-79102 Freiburg im Breisgau / DE | deleted | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 04.11.2011 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.03.2012 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 09.04.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.10.2013 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 23.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 04.08.2020 | Fee for printing new specification paid | 15.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 15.04.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.04.2024 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 24.04.2024 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Appeal following opposition | 24.06.2024 | Appeal received No. T0855/24 | 24.06.2024 | Payment of appeal fee | 19.08.2024 | Statement of grounds filed | 22.11.2013 | Appeal received No. T2378/13 | 03.12.2013 | Payment of appeal fee | 13.02.2014 | Statement of grounds filed | 11.07.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 24.11.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 01.04.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.04.2019 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Petition(s) for review: | Petition for review received | Number: R0005/19 | for appeal No. T2378/13-3502 | Petitioner: OP01 | 15.03.2021 | Decision: Petition for review allowed and re-opening of appeal procedure with total refund of fee for petition for review. | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 29.12.2010 | CZ | 29.12.2010 | DK | 29.12.2010 | EE | 29.12.2010 | FI | 29.12.2010 | HR | 29.12.2010 | HU | 29.12.2010 | IE | 29.12.2010 | IT | 29.12.2010 | LT | 29.12.2010 | LV | 29.12.2010 | MT | 29.12.2010 | NL | 29.12.2010 | PL | 29.12.2010 | RO | 29.12.2010 | SE | 29.12.2010 | SI | 29.12.2010 | SK | 29.12.2010 | TR | 29.12.2010 | LU | 15.02.2011 | BE | 28.02.2011 | MC | 28.02.2011 | BG | 29.03.2011 | NO | 29.03.2011 | GR | 30.03.2011 | ES | 09.04.2011 | IS | 29.04.2011 | PT | 29.04.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 29.12.2010 | |
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
DK | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
HR | 29.12.2010 | ||
IE | 29.12.2010 | ||
IT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
MT | 29.12.2010 | ||
NL | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
TR | 29.12.2010 | ||
LU | 15.02.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
NO | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/42] | CY | 29.12.2010 | |
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
HR | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
NL | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
NO | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | CY | 29.12.2010 | |
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
HR | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
NL | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
NO | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 29.12.2010 | |
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
HR | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
NO | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CY | 29.12.2010 | |
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
HR | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
NO | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | CY | 29.12.2010 | |
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
HR | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
NO | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/34] | CY | 29.12.2010 | |
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
HR | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
NO | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | CY | 29.12.2010 | |
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
HR | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0338218 (CERBERUS AG [CH]) [X] 6,8 * page 3, line 26 - page 5, line 18 * * figures 1-3,6 * [A] 1,3,5,11,12; | [XA]EP0618555 (NOHMI BOSAI LTD [JP]) [X] 6-12 * column 2, line 57 - column 4, line 5 * * column 6, line 53 - column 7, line 37 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 1-4; | [XA]EP1103937 (SIEMENS BUILDING TECH AG [CH]) [X] 6,8-10 * paragraphs [0020] - [0031] * * figures 1,2 *[A] 1-4; | [XA]EP1253565 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]) [X] 6,8-12 * paragraphs [0016] - [0022] * * figures 1-7 * [A] 1-5,7 | by applicant | EP0618555 | Opposition | EP0654770 | WO9714092 | US5691704 | WO9820615 | DE20219524U | DE102004024284 | DE60010411T | - Thomas Net News,'Microcontrollers include internal temperature sensor', (02032005, Fundstelle:http://news.thomasnet./fullstory/, gefunden am 23092011. | - Wikimedia Foundation Inc.,'Mikrocontroller' (21012008, gefunden am 20092011, Fundstelle:http://de.wikipedia.org/wiki/Mikrocontroller) | - Wikimedia Foundation Inc.,'Anwendungsspezifische integrierte Schaltung' (26012008, gefunden am 20092011, Fundstelle:http://de.wikipedia.org/wiki/Anwendungsspedifische_integrierte_Schaltung) | - Wikimedia Foundation Inc.,'Multi-Chip-Modul' (26062007, gefunden am 20092011, Fundstelle:http://de.wikipedia.org/wiki/Multi-Chip-Modul) | - Wikimedia Foundation Inc.,'Die (Halbleitertechnik)' (gefunden am 20092011, Fundstelle:http://de.wikipedia.org/wiki/Die_(Halbleitertechnik) | - Wu, Randy, 'Digital Fan Control with Tachometer using MSP43O.Application report SLAA259-November 2005' | - Texas Instruments,'Application Notes fpr 4xx 8/16MHz LCD series, M5P430(TM) 16-bit Ultra-Low Power MCUs', gefunden am 23092011, Fundsstelle : (http://focus.ti.com/mcu/docs/mcutechdocs.tsp) | - Application Note zum 56F83xx Temperaturesensor von Freescale Semiconductor |