EP2093733 - Smoke detection through two spectrally different light scattering measurements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 12.06.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2019 | Revocation of patent | published on 17.07.2019 [2019/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Schweiz AG Freilagerstrasse 40 8047 Zürich / CH | [2015/04] |
Former [2013/11] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/35] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller, Kurt, Dr. Mattenhofweg 4 8708 Männedorf / CH | 02 /
Loepfe, Markus Im Hölzli 27 8706 Feldmeilen / CH | 03 /
Tenchio, Georges A., Dr. Bachtobelstrasse 32 8123 Ebmatingen / CH | 04 /
Vollenweider, Walter Zugerstrasse 6 6312 Steinhausen / CH | [2009/35] | Representative(s) | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/42] | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08101742.8 | 19.02.2008 | [2009/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2093733 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2093733 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G08B29/04 | [2010/44] | CPC: |
G08B17/107 (EP,US);
G08B29/043 (EP,US);
G08B17/113 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/35] | G08B17/107 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/35] | Title | German: | Rauchdetektion mittels zweier spektral unterschiedlicher Streulichtmessungen | [2009/35] | English: | Smoke detection through two spectrally different light scattering measurements | [2009/35] | French: | Détection de fumée à l'aide de deux mesures à lumière diffusée spectrales différentes | [2009/35] | Examination procedure | 19.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/13] | 12.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
27.01.2012
07.02.2012
ADMISSIBLE Novar GmbH Dieselstrasse 2 41469 Neuss / DE Opponent's representative Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/27] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.01.2012
07.02.2012
ADMISSIBLE Novar GmbH Dieselstrasse 2 41469 Neuss / DE Opponent's representative Henkel, Breuer & Partner Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2018/17] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.01.2012
07.02.2012
ADMISSIBLE Novar GmbH Dieselstrasse 2 41469 Neuss / DE Opponent's representative Henkel, Breuer & Partner Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 DE-80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/10] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.01.2012
Novar GmbH Dieselstrasse 2 41469 Neuss / DE Opponent's representative Wenning, Ekkehard Henkel, Breuer & Partner Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 05.03.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.07.2012 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 21.11.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.12.2013 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 12.12.2013 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 13.05.2019 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2019/29] | 03.06.2019 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 07.02.2014 | Appeal received No. T0322/14 | 22.04.2014 | Statement of grounds filed | 13.05.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 13.05.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.05.2019 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.02.2008 | CY | 27.04.2011 | CZ | 27.04.2011 | DK | 27.04.2011 | EE | 27.04.2011 | FI | 27.04.2011 | HR | 27.04.2011 | IE | 27.04.2011 | IT | 27.04.2011 | LT | 27.04.2011 | LV | 27.04.2011 | MT | 27.04.2011 | PL | 27.04.2011 | RO | 27.04.2011 | SE | 27.04.2011 | SI | 27.04.2011 | SK | 27.04.2011 | TR | 27.04.2011 | BG | 27.07.2011 | NO | 27.07.2011 | GR | 28.07.2011 | ES | 07.08.2011 | IS | 27.08.2011 | PT | 29.08.2011 | LU | 19.02.2012 | BE | 28.02.2012 | MC | 29.02.2012 | [2018/17] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 19.02.2008 | |
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
HR | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
IT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
MT | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
TR | 27.04.2011 | ||
BG | 27.07.2011 | ||
NO | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
LU | 19.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
HR | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
IT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
MT | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
TR | 27.04.2011 | ||
BG | 27.07.2011 | ||
NO | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
LU | 19.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
HR | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
IT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
MT | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
TR | 27.04.2011 | ||
BG | 27.07.2011 | ||
NO | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
HR | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
IT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
MT | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
BG | 27.07.2011 | ||
NO | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
HR | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
IT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
BG | 27.07.2011 | ||
NO | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/12] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
HR | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
NO | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
HR | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
NO | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
HR | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
NO | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
HR | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
NO | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 27.04.2011 | |
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
NO | 27.07.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 27.04.2011 | |
NO | 27.07.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0099729 (CHLORIDE GROUP PLC [GB]) [A] 8 * abstract * * page 9, lines 18-24 *; | [A]US4654644 (DOBRZANSKI JOHN J [US]) [A] 8 * abstract * * column 2, lines 6-18 *; | [Y]US4857895 (KAPRELIAN EDWARD K [US]) [Y] 2,12 * abstract * * column 2, line 63 - column 2, line L * * column 4, lines 33-49 * * column 5, lines 26-41; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0901113 (AMLANI MANHAR [GB]) [A] 9* the whole document *; | [X]JP2005115970 (NITTAN CO LTD) [X] 1,3,5-7,10,11,13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0036] , [0060] - [0065] *; | [XAY]EP1688898 (HOCHIKI CO [JP]) [X] 1,3-8,10,13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0052] , [0058] , [0063] , [0064] , [0119] - [0126] - [0137] , [0139] , [0174] , [0183] , [0190] , [0191]; figures 1-35 * [A] 9 [Y] 2,12 | by applicant | JP2005115970 | EP0472039 | EP1039426 | DE102004001699 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, & JP2005115970 A 00000000 |