EP1965361 - An electronic transaction and application terminal with visual identification checking capability [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.03.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fonoklik Iletisim Hizmetleri Ve Ticaret Anonim Sirketi Eski Buyukdere Caddesi Iz Plaza Giz 4/26 Maslak 34398 Istanbul / TR | [2008/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yurkeli, Ahmet Fonoklik Iletisim Hizmetleri Ve Ticaret Anonim Sirketi Itu Ari-1 Teknokent Itu Ayazaga Yerleskesi Ayazaga Istanbul / TR | [2008/36] | Representative(s) | Dericioglu Kurt, Ekin Ankara Patent Bureau Limited Kavaklidere Mahallesi Bestekar Caddesi No: 10 06680 Cankaya, Ankara / TR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | Dericioglu, Ekin Ankara Patent Bureau Limited Bestekar Sokak No: 10 Kavaklidere 06680 Ankara / TR | Application number, filing date | 08102196.6 | 29.02.2008 | [2008/36] | Priority number, date | TR20070001279 | 01.03.2007 Original published format: TR 200701279 | TR20080001341 | 29.02.2008 Original published format: TR 200801341 | [2008/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1965361 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1965361 | Date: | 02.09.2009 | [2009/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G07F19/00 | [2008/36] | CPC: |
G07F19/207 (EP);
G07F19/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Elektronisches Transaktions- und Anwendungsendgerät mit visueller Identifkationsprüffunktion | [2008/36] | English: | An electronic transaction and application terminal with visual identification checking capability | [2008/36] | French: | Terminal de transaction électroniques et d'applications doté d'une capacité de contrôle visuel de l'identification | [2008/36] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/15] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2004025473 (AVERY DENNISON CORP [US]) [X] 1-2 * abstract * * page 8, line 4 - page 9, line 2 * * page 10, lines 13-26 * * figure - *; | [X]WO9930267 (SOLTESZ JOHN A [US], et al) [X] 1-2 * abstract * * page 1, line 3 - page 2, line 5 * * page 15, line 20 - page 19, line 10 * * figure - *; | [A]US2004186744 (LUX CINDY M [US]) [A] 1-2 * abstract *; | [A]WO0079360 (REED THOMAS K JR [US]) [A] 1-2 * abstract * * page 7, lines 1-18 * * figure - *; | [A]WO0233664 (ITALDATA INGEGNERIA DELL IDEA [IT], et al) [A] 1-2 * abstract * * page 1, lines 5-8 * * page 6, lines 4-11 * * page 8, lines 18-32 * * figure - * | by applicant | JP2004355646 |