EP1970012 - Trocar for thoracic surgery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AB Medica S.p.A. Via Nerviano, 31 20020 Lainate (MI) / IT | [2011/23] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Elenor S.R.L. Via del Fosso, 5 52100 Arezzo / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ferrari, Danilo / Via M. Cesti, 1 52100, Arezzo / IT | [2011/44] |
Former [2008/38] | 01 /
Ferrari, Danilo Via M. Cesti, 1 52100, Arezzo / IT | Representative(s) | Bardini, Marco Luigi, et al Società Italiana Brevetti SpA Corso dei Tintori, 25 50122 Firenze / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Bardini, Marco Luigi, et al c/o Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Corso dei Tintori, 25 50122 Firenze / IT | Application number, filing date | 08102428.3 | 10.03.2008 | [2008/38] | Priority number, date | IT2007FI00060 | 14.03.2007 Original published format: IT FI20070060 | [2008/38] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1970012 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1970012 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/02, A61B17/34 | [2008/38] | CPC: |
A61B17/02 (EP,US);
A61B17/3439 (EP,US);
A61B17/0293 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/38] | Title | German: | Trokar für die Thoraxchirurgie | [2008/38] | English: | Trocar for thoracic surgery | [2008/38] | French: | Trocart pour chirurgie thoracique | [2008/38] | Examination procedure | 28.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/02] | 07.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.01.2009 | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   21.09.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.03.2008 | BE | 02.11.2011 | CY | 02.11.2011 | CZ | 02.11.2011 | EE | 02.11.2011 | FI | 02.11.2011 | LT | 02.11.2011 | LV | 02.11.2011 | MT | 02.11.2011 | PL | 02.11.2011 | RO | 02.11.2011 | SI | 02.11.2011 | SK | 02.11.2011 | TR | 02.11.2011 | BG | 02.02.2012 | GR | 03.02.2012 | IS | 02.03.2012 | PT | 02.03.2012 | MC | 31.03.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
FI | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
MT | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
TR | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
FI | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
MT | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
FI | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 02.11.2011 | |
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 02.11.2011 | |
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 02.11.2011 | |
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 02.11.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB330629 (EDWARD BARON) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]US2005165281 (RAVIKUMAR SUNDARAM [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US2006052672 (LANDRY MICHAEL E [US], et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [X]WO2006117819 (ELENOR S R L [IT], et al) [X] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [X]US2007010716 (MALANDAIN HUGUES F [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0086]; figure 20 * | by applicant | GB330629 | US2005165281 | US2006052672 | WO2006117819 | US2007010716 |