Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009209913 | Global Dossier | 20.08.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITFI20070060 | 14.03.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1970012 | Global Dossier | 02.11.2011 | B1 | EP1970012 | 17.09.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITFI20070060 | 14.03.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE531322T | 15.11.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | ITFI20070060 | 14.03.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1970012T | 27.02.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | ITFI20070060 | 14.03.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2376051T | 08.03.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | ITFI20070060 | 14.03.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20110983T | 31.03.2012 | T1 | Priority number | Date | ITFI20070060 | 14.03.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ITFI20070060 | 15.09.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITFI20070060 | 14.03.2007 |