EP1974794 - Filter element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.2019 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MANN+HUMMEL GmbH Schwieberdinger Str. 126 71636 Ludwigsburg / DE | [2018/52] |
Former [2008/40] | For all designated states MANN+HUMMEL GmbH Hindenburgstrasse 45 71638 Ludwigsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Volkmer, Daniel Brühlwiesen 14 71282 Hemmingen / DE | 02 /
Brenneis, Fritz Akazienweg 5 84163 Marklkofen / DE | 03 /
Grad, Maximilian Schulweg 7a 84163 Marklkofen / DE | 04 /
Weindl, Markus Im Mittererfeld 4 84163 Steinberg / DE | [2019/01] |
Former [2008/40] | 01 /
Volkmer, Daniel Habichtstr. 29 84130 Dingolfing / DE | ||
02 /
Brenneis, Fritz Akazienweg 5 84163 Marklkofen / DE | |||
03 /
Grad, Maximilian Schulweg 7a 84163 Marklkofen / DE | |||
04 /
Weindl, Markus Im Mittererfeld 4 84163 Steinberg / DE | Representative(s) | Börger, Saskia Lena, et al Mann+Hummel International GmbH & Co.KG Schwieberdinger Straße 126 71636 Ludwigsburg / DE | [2019/01] | Application number, filing date | 08102669.2 | 17.03.2008 | [2008/40] | Priority number, date | DE20072004794U | 30.03.2007 Original published format: DE 202007004794 U | [2008/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1974794 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1974794 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | [2009/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1974794 | Date: | 02.01.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B01D46/52, B01D46/00, B60H3/06, B01D46/10 | [2009/47] | CPC: |
B01D46/521 (EP,US);
B01D46/0005 (EP,US);
B01D46/10 (EP,US);
B60H3/0658 (EP,US);
B01D2271/02 (EP,US);
B60H2001/00635 (EP,US);
Y10S55/31 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/40] | B01D46/52, B01D46/00, B60H3/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/01] |
Former [2008/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Filterelement | [2008/40] | English: | Filter element | [2008/40] | French: | Elément de filtre | [2008/40] | Examination procedure | 12.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/08] | 09.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 25.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 10.06.2015 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 01.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Appeal following examination | 13.07.2015 | Appeal received No. T0046/16 | 20.10.2015 | Statement of grounds filed | 22.03.2018 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2018/12] | 22.05.2018 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2018/21] | 07.06.2018 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | Divisional application(s) | EP18213965.9 / EP3485958 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/50] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 28.11.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 28.11.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.02.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.03.2008 | CY | 02.01.2019 | CZ | 02.01.2019 | DK | 02.01.2019 | EE | 02.01.2019 | ES | 02.01.2019 | FI | 02.01.2019 | HR | 02.01.2019 | IT | 02.01.2019 | LT | 02.01.2019 | LV | 02.01.2019 | MC | 02.01.2019 | MT | 02.01.2019 | NL | 02.01.2019 | PL | 02.01.2019 | RO | 02.01.2019 | SE | 02.01.2019 | SI | 02.01.2019 | SK | 02.01.2019 | TR | 02.01.2019 | AT | 17.03.2019 | IE | 17.03.2019 | LU | 17.03.2019 | BE | 31.03.2019 | CH | 31.03.2019 | LI | 31.03.2019 | BG | 02.04.2019 | GB | 02.04.2019 | NO | 02.04.2019 | GR | 03.04.2019 | IS | 02.05.2019 | PT | 02.05.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | CY | 02.01.2019 | |
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
MT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
AT | 17.03.2019 | ||
IE | 17.03.2019 | ||
LU | 17.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
GB | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | CZ | 02.01.2019 | |
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
MT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
AT | 17.03.2019 | ||
IE | 17.03.2019 | ||
LU | 17.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
GB | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | CZ | 02.01.2019 | |
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
MT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IE | 17.03.2019 | ||
LU | 17.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
GB | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | CZ | 02.01.2019 | |
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IE | 17.03.2019 | ||
LU | 17.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
GB | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | CZ | 02.01.2019 | |
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
IE | 17.03.2019 | ||
LU | 17.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
GB | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | CZ | 02.01.2019 | |
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
IE | 17.03.2019 | ||
LU | 17.03.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | CZ | 02.01.2019 | |
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
LU | 17.03.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | CZ | 02.01.2019 | |
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 02.01.2019 | |
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | ES | 02.01.2019 | |
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | ES | 02.01.2019 | |
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | ES | 02.01.2019 | |
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | ES | 02.01.2019 | |
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | ES | 02.01.2019 | |
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 02.01.2019 | |
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 02.01.2019 | |
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | NL | 02.01.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE10324681 (SANDLER HELMUT HELSA WERKE [DE]) [X] 1-3,8,10,14-17 * figures 4,6,8 *; | [X]DE19512678 (FREUDENBERG CARL FA [DE]) [X] 1,3-4,8,10,14-15,17 * figure 1 *; | [XI]EP1134014 (FREUDENBERG CARL FA [DE]) [X] 1,3-5,8,10,13-15 * figures 2,8,9 * [I] 6-7,12; | [XD]DE10241748 (SANDLER HELMUT HELSA WERKE [DE]) [XD] 1-3,8,14-17 * figures 3,4,5 *; | [XD]DE10231696 (B & S INDUSTRIESERVICE GMBH [DE]) [XD] 1,3,5,8-11,13-17 * figures 9,10,11,12,13,14,15 * | Examination | DE19512678 | by applicant | DE10231696 | DE10241748 | DE19512678 | DE10324681 |