EP1980679 - Exterior wall of a building, with masonry bond made of bricks and method for producing bricks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.03.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.04.2012 [2012/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CRH Clay Solutions GmbH Unter den Eichen 13 31226 Peine / DE | [2009/17] |
Former [2008/42] | For all designated states AKA Ziegelgruppe GmbH Unter den Eichen 13 31226 Peine / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arntjen, Claus Im Höhnhausen 35 67157 Wachenheim / DE | [2008/42] | Representative(s) | Einsel, Martin Patentanwälte Einsel & Kollegen Jasperallee 1a 38102 Braunschweig / DE | [2008/42] | Application number, filing date | 08103200.5 | 31.03.2008 | [2008/42] | Priority number, date | DE20071016798 | 05.04.2007 Original published format: DE102007016798 | [2008/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1980679 | Date: | 15.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1980679 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | [2011/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | E04B2/00, E04C1/39, F24J2/00, B28B3/26, B28B11/08, B28B11/12 | [2011/09] | CPC: |
E04C1/392 (EP,US);
B28B11/0863 (EP);
B28B11/12 (EP);
F24S20/66 (EP,US);
B28B11/16 (EP);
B28B3/20 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2008/42] | E04B2/00, E04C1/39, F24J2/00 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2011/45] |
Former [2008/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Aussenwand eines Gebäudes, mit einem Mauerwerksverband aus Mauersteinen, und Verfahren zur Herstellung der Mauersteine | [2008/42] | English: | Exterior wall of a building, with masonry bond made of bricks and method for producing bricks | [2008/42] | French: | Mur extérieur d'un immeuble d'une construction murale en briques et procédé de fabrication des briques | [2008/42] | Examination procedure | 06.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/15] | 14.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE10350879 (HESSE HEIKO [DE]) [Y] 1-9 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0010] * * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [Y]DE19632017 (HIESL GERHARD [DE]) [Y] 1-9 * column 1, line 3 - line 6 * * column 1, line 25 - line 36; figures 1,2; claims 1-4 *; | [Y]DE29715281U (BRECHT THOMAS [DE]) [Y] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE2508020 (MUEHLACKER ZIEGELWERK AG) [Y] 4-6 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0028840 (KRUGER BERNHARD [DE]) [Y] 9 * page 10, line 15 - line 16 *; | [X]CH566851 (MASCH WERKZEUG VERKAUFS ANST) [X] 10,11 * column 1, line 1 - line 5 * * column 1, line 23 - line 29 * * column 1, line 43 - line 45 * * column 1, line 53 - column 2, line 13; figures 1-2; claim 1 *; | [XI]DE2213357 (WAFFENSCHMIDT & CO) [X] 10-13 * page 10, paragraph 2; figure 1 * [I] 14; | [XI]DE1074479 (AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT FÜR GROB-UND FEINKERAMIK [DE]) [X] 10-13 * column 1, line 1 - line 24 * * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 2 * * column 2, line 40 - column 4, line 10; figures 1,2 * [I] 14; | [A]DE2911552 (FRIDERICHS PETER) [A] 1-9 * page 3, paragraph 1 * * page 5, paragraph 1 * * page 5, paragraph 3 * * page 7, paragraph 2 * * page 8, paragraph 4 * * page 10, paragraph 3 - paragraph 5; figures 1-6 *; | [A]GB2426984 (SAGKIONIS ANTONIOS [GR]) [A] 1-9 * page 1, line 1 - line 5 * * page 1, line 10 - line 14 * * page 2, line 1 - line 18 * * page 3, line 24 - page 5, line 7; figures 1,1a,2,2a,2b * | by applicant | DE2508020 | DE4421654 | DE3011289 | US3299595 | DE4124982 | DE19819230 | DE102005010266 |