EP1993025 - Delay judgment systems and methods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.05.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.06.2015 [2015/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HTC Corporation No. 23, Xinghua Road Taoyuan District Taoyuan City 330 / TW | [2015/13] |
Former [2010/22] | For all designated states HTC Corporation No. 23, Xinghua Road Taoyuan City Taoyuan County 330 / TW | ||
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states High Tech Computer Corp. No. 23, Hsin-Hua Rd. Taoyuan / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hsu, Chih-Feng No. 23, Hsin Hua Rd. Taoyuan / TW | 02 /
Kao, Yih-Feng No. 23, Hsin Hua Rd. Taoyuan / TW | 03 /
Wang, John C. No. 23, Hsin Hua Rd. Taoyuan / TW | 04 /
Huang, Ming-San No. 23, Hsin Hua Rd. Taoyuan / TW | [2008/47] | Representative(s) | 2K Patentanwälte Blasberg Kewitz & Reichel Partnerschaft mbB Schumannstrasse 27 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | 2K Patentanwälte Kewitz & Kollegen Partnerschaft Corneliusstrasse 18 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 08103935.6 | 13.05.2008 | [2008/47] | Priority number, date | TW20070117203 | 15.05.2007 Original published format: TW 96117203 | [2008/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1993025 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1993025 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | [2008/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/041 | [2008/47] | CPC: |
G06F3/0488 (EP,US);
G06F3/0416 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/32] |
Former [2008/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Systeme und Verfahren für Verzögerungsbeurteilung | [2008/47] | English: | Delay judgment systems and methods | [2008/47] | French: | Systèmes et procédés d'évaluation de retard | [2008/47] | Examination procedure | 26.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/32] | 27.05.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 19.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/26] | 16.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.07.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2002080123 (KENNEDY PETER J [US], et al) [Y] 3-7,10-14 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0047] *[A] 1,2,8,9,15; | [XY]US2006142970 (SACHS TODD S [US], et al) [X] 1,2,8,9,15 * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0077] * [Y] 3-7,10-14 | by applicant | US2002080123 | US2006142970 |