EP1998221 - E-paper apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.2013 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.12.2013 [2013/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pervasive Display Co. Ltd. No. 71, Delun Road Rende District Tainan City 717 / TW | [2011/29] |
Former [2008/49] | For all designated states Gigno Technology Co., Ltd. 3F.-2, No.88, Sec. 3 Chongcing N. Rd. Datong Taipei City 103 / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sah, Wen-Jyh 6F., No.6, Lane 109 Fucian 1st St. 700 Tainan City / TW | [2013/03] |
Former [2008/49] | 01 /
Sah, Wen-Jyh 6F., No.6, Lane 109 Fucian 1st St. 700 Tainan City / TW | Representative(s) | 2K Patentanwälte Blasberg Kewitz & Reichel Partnerschaft mbB Schumannstrasse 27 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | 2K Patentanwälte Blasberg Kewitz & Reichel Partnerschaft Corneliusstraße 18 60325 Frankfurt a. M. / DE | ||
Former [2008/49] | 2K Patentanwälte Kewitz & Kollegen Partnerschaft Corneliusstrasse 18 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 08104163.4 | 29.05.2008 | [2008/49] | Priority number, date | TW20070119865 | 01.06.2007 Original published format: TW 96119865 | [2008/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1998221 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1998221 | Date: | 28.01.2009 | [2009/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1998221 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1345, G02F1/167, G02F1/1335 | [2012/37] | CPC: |
G02F1/133514 (EP);
G02F1/167 (EP,US);
G02F1/133516 (EP);
G02F1/13452 (EP);
G02F1/1677 (EP,US);
G02F1/1339 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2008/49] | G02F1/167, G02F1/1335, G02F1/13 | Designated contracting states | FR, NL, SE [2009/40] |
Former [2008/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | E-Papiergerät | [2008/49] | English: | E-paper apparatus | [2008/49] | French: | Appareil de E-document | [2008/49] | Examination procedure | 21.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/36] | 24.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.07.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NO, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 21.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11177919.5 / EP2388644 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.08.2009 | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0005704 (E INK CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * page 10, line 3 - page 18, line 4; figures 4A-9 *; | [XA]WO0036465 (E INK CORP [US]) [X] 1-5,7-9 * page 6, line 1 - page 12, line 9; figures 1-7b * [A] 6; | [Y]US2003214612 (FREEMAN GARY A [US]) [Y] 13-15* paragraphs [0031] - [0033] - [0044] - [0046]; figures 1A-1C; claim 6 *; | [A]JP2006113157 (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [XY]US2006103915 (KAWAI HIDEYUKI [JP]) [X] 1,2,10-12 * paragraphs [0054] , [0111] - [0114]; figures 1-11A * [Y] 13-15; | [XP]WO2007063440 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [XP] 1,2,10,11 * page 3, line 21 - page 6, line 17; figure 3 * |