EP2133303 - Brake positioning system for lifting jacks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.11.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Strödter, Wilhelm Zinnienstrasse 26 59071 Hamm / DE | [2009/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Strödter, Wilhelm Zinnienstrasse 26 59071 Hamm / DE | 02 /
Kampe, Norbert Ammerweg 94 59071 Hamm / DE | [2009/51] | Representative(s) | Wablat Lange Karthaus Anwaltssozietät Potsdamer Chaussee 48 14129 Berlin / DE | [2010/27] |
Former [2009/51] | Effert, Udo Effert und Kollegen Patentanwälte Gross-Berliner-Damm 73 E 12487 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 08104367.1 | 11.06.2008 | [2009/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2133303 | Date: | 16.12.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B66C9/18, B66C13/30, B66D3/18 | [2009/51] | CPC: |
B66C9/18 (EP);
B66C13/30 (EP);
B66D3/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/34] |
Former [2009/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Brems-Positioniersystem für Hebezeuge | [2009/51] | English: | Brake positioning system for lifting jacks | [2009/51] | French: | Système de positionnement et de freinage pour engins de levage | [2009/51] | Examination procedure | 17.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/49] | 26.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/49] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP1167273 (ATECS MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [DA] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5685227 (GACCETTA JOSEPH M [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | DE19983240T | US7043337 | US6612449 | EP1167273 | DE692857 | DD218071 | DD218879 | EP0591304 | EP1460025 |