EP2141947 - Dynamic reconfiguration of a communication network for efficient energy consumption in case of double coverage detection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/01] | Method of dynamically reconfiguring a communication network | ||
[2012/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | [2013/46] |
Former [2010/01] | For all designated states Nokia Siemens Networks OY Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ahonpää, Timo Siipikuja 1 A 29 90240 Oulu / FI | 02 /
Alminoja, Jyrki Kyyninkatu 12 A 8 37100 Nokia / FI | 03 /
Bohdanowicz, Adrian ul. Weigla 3a/7 53-114 Wroclaw / PL | 04 /
Lachowski, Jaroslaw TatrzañskaStrasse 27 33-300 Nowy Sacz / PL | 05 /
Martikkala, Risto Kamulankuja 8 90800 Oulu / FI | 06 /
Scheck, Hans-Otto Hanikka 14 02360 Espoo / FI | 07 /
Vuopala, Tapio Anteronrinne 1 90830 Haukipudas / FI | [2012/44] |
Former [2012/43] | 01 /
Ahonpää, Timo Siipikuja 1 A 29 90240 Oulu / FI | ||
02 /
Alminoja, Jyrki Kyyninkatu 12 A 8 37100 Nokia / FI | |||
03 /
Bohdanowicz, Adrian ul. Weigla 3a/7 53-114 Wroclaw / PL | |||
04 /
Lachowski, Jaroslaw TatrzañskaStrasse 27 33-300 Nowy Sacz / PL | |||
05 /
Martikkala, Risto Kamulankuja 8 90800 Oulu / FI | |||
06 /
Scheck, Hans-Otto Hanikka 14 02360 Espoo / FI | |||
07 /
VUOPALA Tapio Anteronrinne 1 90830 Haukipudas / FI | |||
Former [2012/36] | 01 /
Ahonpää, Timo Siipikuja 1 A 29 90240 Oulu / FI | ||
02 /
Alminoja, Jyrki Kyyninkatu 12 A 8 37100 Nokia / FI | |||
03 /
Bohdanowicz, Adrian ul. Weigla 3a/7 53-114 Wroclaw / PL | |||
04 /
Lachowski, Jaroslaw TatrzañskaStrasse 27 33-300 Nowy Sacz / PL | |||
05 /
Martikkala, Risto Kamulankuja 8 90800 Oulu / FI | |||
06 /
Scheck, Hans-Otto Hanikka 14 02360 Espoo / FI | |||
Former [2010/01] | 01 /
Ahonpää, Timo Siipikuja 1 A 29 90240 Oulu / FI | ||
02 /
Alminoja, Jyrki Kyyninkatu 12 A 8 90240 Oulu37100 Nokia / FI | |||
03 /
Bohdanowicz, Adrian ul. Weigla 3a/7 53-114 Wroclaw / PL | |||
04 /
Lachowski, Jaroslaw TatrzañskaStrasse 27 33-300 Nowy Sacz / PL | |||
05 /
Martikkala, Risto Kamulankuja 8 90800 Oulu / FI | |||
06 /
Scheck, Hans-Otto Hanikka 14 02360 Espoo / FI | Representative(s) | Borgström, Markus, et al Nokia Solutions and Networks Management International GmbH NET T&I IPR St-Martin-Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/46] | Borgström, Markus, et al Nokia Solutions and Networks GmbH & Co. KG CEF T&I IPR / Patent Administration 80240 Munich / DE | ||
Former [2013/01] | Bruglachner, Thomas E. Nokia Siemens Networks Oy COO RTP IPR / Patent Administration 80240 Munich / DE | ||
Former [2010/01] | Bruglachner, Thomas E. Nokia Siemens Networks Oy COO RTP IPR / Patent Administration 80240 Munich / DE | Application number, filing date | 08104638.5 | 04.07.2008 | [2010/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2141947 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2141947 | Date: | 02.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/02, // H04W88/08 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
H04W24/02 (EP);
H04W52/0206 (EP);
H04W36/22 (EP);
H04W88/08 (EP);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/01] | Title | German: | Dynamische Rekonfiguration eines Kommunikationsnetzwerks zwecks effizienten Energieverbrauchs bei Erkennung von Doppelabdeckung | [2012/33] | English: | Dynamic reconfiguration of a communication network for efficient energy consumption in case of double coverage detection | [2012/33] | French: | Reconfiguration dynamique d'un réseau de communication pour une consommation efficiente d'énergie dans le cas de détection de couverture double | [2012/33] |
Former [2010/01] | Verfahren zur dynamischen Rekonfiguration eines Kommunikationsnetzwerks | ||
Former [2010/01] | Method of dynamically reconfiguring a communication network | ||
Former [2010/01] | Procédé de reconfiguration dynamique d'un réseau de communication | Examination procedure | 06.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/33] | 29.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 03.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 11.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/50] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 03.07.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 03.07.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.07.2012 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 22.03.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 22.03.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.03.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.07.2008 | AT | 02.01.2013 | BE | 02.01.2013 | CY | 02.01.2013 | CZ | 02.01.2013 | DK | 02.01.2013 | EE | 02.01.2013 | FI | 02.01.2013 | HR | 02.01.2013 | IT | 02.01.2013 | LT | 02.01.2013 | LV | 02.01.2013 | MC | 02.01.2013 | MT | 02.01.2013 | NL | 02.01.2013 | PL | 02.01.2013 | RO | 02.01.2013 | SE | 02.01.2013 | SI | 02.01.2013 | SK | 02.01.2013 | TR | 02.01.2013 | BG | 02.04.2013 | NO | 02.04.2013 | GR | 03.04.2013 | ES | 13.04.2013 | IS | 02.05.2013 | PT | 02.05.2013 | IE | 04.07.2013 | LU | 04.07.2013 | CH | 31.07.2013 | FR | 31.07.2013 | LI | 31.07.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CY | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
IT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
MC | 02.01.2013 | ||
MT | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
TR | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
IE | 04.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
FR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CY | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
IT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
MC | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
IE | 04.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
FR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CY | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
IT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
MC | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
FR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CY | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
IT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
MC | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CY | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
IT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
MC | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CY | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
IT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CY | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 02.01.2013 | |
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 02.01.2013 | |
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 02.01.2013 | |
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | SI | 02.01.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6829491 (YEA JI-HAE [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * column 1, line 42 - line 48 * * column 2, line 2 - line 29 * * column 3, line 2 - line 60 * * column 5, line 16 - column 6, line 47 * * column 7, line 7 - line 16 * * column 8, line 45 - line 66 * * column 9, line 11 - line 32 * * column 9, line 66 - column 10, line 3 * * column 10, line 33 - line 50 * * figures 2A,2B,3 *; | [X]WO2008025874 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 2, line 1 - line 12 * * page 4, line 12 - line 21 * * page 7, line 1 - line 11 * * page 7, line 20 - page 8, line 7 * * page 10, line 4 - line 17 * * page 11, line 1 - line 8 * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]EP1799000 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0078] * * paragraph [0136] - paragraph [0142] * * paragraph [0148] - paragraph [0153] * * paragraph [0170] - paragraph [0182] *; | [XA]EP1841251 (NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,5-7,10,12-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0024] * [A] 2-4,8,9,11; | [A]WO2008030171 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0042] * |