EP2143923 - Charged internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.10.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.08.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, LLC Fairlane Plaza South 330 Town Center Drive Suite 800 Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | [2010/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuhlbach, Kai Am Rittersteg 60 51427, Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 02 /
Friedfeldt, Rainer Kaspar-Zopes-Str. 18 50354 Hürth / DE | 03 /
Bohn, Peter Demmerweg 20 52391, Vettweiss / DE | [2010/02] | Representative(s) | Illing, Rolf, et al Ford-Werke GmbH Patentabteilung NH-364 Henry-Ford-Straße 1 50735 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/02] | Drömer, Hans-Carsten Ford-Werke Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung NH/DRP Henry-Ford-Strasse 1 50725 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 08104766.4 | 16.07.2008 | [2010/02] | Priority number, date | EP20080104729 | 11.07.2008 Original published format: EP 08104729 | [2010/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2143923 | Date: | 13.01.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F02F1/24, F02B37/18, F01N13/00 | [2010/02] | CPC: |
F02F1/243 (EP);
F01N13/10 (EP);
F02B37/02 (EP);
F02B39/005 (EP);
F02B37/18 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, RO, TR [2010/37] |
Former [2010/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Aufgeladene Brennkraftmaschine | [2010/02] | English: | Charged internal combustion engine | [2010/02] | French: | Moteur à combustion interne suralimenté | [2010/02] | Examination procedure | 06.08.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/33] | 14.07.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.08.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, SE, SI, SK | 26.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 03.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/46] | 26.06.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.08.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2019 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3821935 (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [X]US2005144946 (CLAUS HARTMUT [DE]) [X] 1-5,7-10,12 * paragraphs [0012] , [0014] , [0015] *; | [A]JP2006194227 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1* abstract * | Examination | JP2006063851 | EP2113648 | by applicant | EP20080100145 |