EP2037201 - Charge air module for a combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.08.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.10.2012 [2012/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pierburg GmbH Alfred-Pierburg-Strasse 1 41460 Neuss / DE | [2009/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hüsges, Hans-Jürgen Hörenweg 18 47877, Willich / DE | 02 /
Kühnel, Hans-Ulrich Kranichstr. 5 41239, Mönchengladbach / DE | [2009/12] | Representative(s) | terpatent PartGmbB Burgunderstraße 29 40549 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/04] | Patentanwälte ter Smitten Eberlein Rütten Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Burgunderstr. 29 40549 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2009/12] | Patentanwälte ter Smitten Burgunder Strasse 29 40549 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 08104970.2 | 06.08.2008 | [2009/12] | Priority number, date | DE20071043992 | 14.09.2007 Original published format: DE102007043992 | [2009/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2037201 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/12] | Classification | IPC: | F28D9/00, F28F3/04, F28F3/12, F02B29/04 | [2009/12] | CPC: |
F02B29/0462 (EP);
F28D9/0081 (EP);
F28F3/048 (EP);
F28F3/12 (EP);
F28D2021/0082 (EP);
F28F2255/16 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Ladeluftmodul für eine Verbrennungskraftmaschine | [2009/12] | English: | Charge air module for a combustion engine | [2009/12] | French: | Module d'air de suralimentation pour un moteur à combustion interne | [2009/12] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/40] | 26.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2011 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | DE102005053924 | DE102004047901 | DE10305031 |