EP2156921 - Device for reducing oscillations of a tool spindle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Step-Tec AG Industriestrasse 45 4542 Luterbach / CH | [2010/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schneider, Kurt Jägerweg 3 2565, Jens / CH | 02 /
Monnin, Jérémie Weyernweg 4 2560, Nidau / CH | 03 /
Reinhard, Edwin Grossacherweg 14 3362, Niederönz / CH | [2010/08] | Representative(s) | De Colle, Piergiacomo, et al Georg Fischer AG Amsler-Laffon-Strasse 9 8201 Schaffhausen / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2011/04] | De Colle, Piergiacomo, et al Georg Fischer AG Amsler-Laffon-Strasse 9 8201 Schaffhausen / CH | ||
Former [2010/08] | Weiss, Wolfgang Georg Fischer AG Patentabteilung Amsler-Laffon-Strasse 9 8201 Schaffhausen / CH | Application number, filing date | 08105090.8 | 21.08.2008 | [2010/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2156921 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2156921 | Date: | 26.10.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q1/34, B23Q1/70, B23Q11/00, B24B41/00 | [2010/08] | CPC: |
B23Q1/70 (EP,US);
B23Q1/34 (EP,US);
B23Q11/0032 (EP,US);
B24B41/042 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/08] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Verminderung von Schwingungen einer Werkzeugspindel | [2010/08] | English: | Device for reducing oscillations of a tool spindle | [2010/08] | French: | Dispositif de réduction d'oscillations d'une broche d'outil | [2010/08] | Examination procedure | 14.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/25] | 08.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.08.2008 | CY | 26.10.2011 | CZ | 26.10.2011 | DK | 26.10.2011 | EE | 26.10.2011 | FI | 26.10.2011 | HR | 26.10.2011 | IE | 26.10.2011 | LT | 26.10.2011 | LV | 26.10.2011 | MT | 26.10.2011 | NL | 26.10.2011 | PL | 26.10.2011 | RO | 26.10.2011 | SE | 26.10.2011 | SI | 26.10.2011 | SK | 26.10.2011 | TR | 26.10.2011 | BG | 26.01.2012 | NO | 26.01.2012 | GR | 27.01.2012 | ES | 06.02.2012 | IS | 26.02.2012 | PT | 27.02.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | CY | 26.10.2011 | |
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
FI | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
IE | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
MT | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
TR | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
ES | 06.02.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CY | 26.10.2011 | |
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
FI | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
IE | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
MT | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
ES | 06.02.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 26.10.2011 | |
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
FI | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
IE | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
ES | 06.02.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 26.10.2011 | |
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
IE | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
ES | 06.02.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 26.10.2011 | |
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
IE | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 26.10.2011 | |
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
IE | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 26.10.2011 | |
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 26.10.2011 | |
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | HR | 26.10.2011 | |
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | LT | 26.10.2011 | |
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 26.10.2011 | |
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 26.10.2011 | |
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 26.10.2011 | |
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 26.10.2011 | |
NO | 26.01.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CH653590 (STUDER AG FRITZ MASCHF) [X] 1-3,10 * column 3, line 6 - line 11; figure 1; claims 1,4 *; | [A]DE19531506 (NAXOS UNION SCHLEIFMITTEL [DE]) [A] 1-11* figure 2 *; | [X]EP1175960 (STUDER AG FRITZ [CH]) [X] 1 * claim 4 * | by applicant | DE10344293 | EP1882548 |