EP2048516 - Spatial resolution driver assist system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.07.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.08.2010 [2010/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH C/IPE Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2009/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weilkes, Michael Langes Feld 19 31199 Diekholzen / DE | 02 /
Zimmermann, Uwe Im Hof 6 71686 Remseck / DE | [2009/16] | Application number, filing date | 08105297.9 | 11.09.2008 | [2009/16] | Priority number, date | DE20071048848 | 11.10.2007 Original published format: DE102007048848 | [2009/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2048516 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2048516 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | [2009/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/93, G01S15/93, G01S17/93, B60W30/06, B60W30/08 | [2009/16] | CPC: |
G01S13/931 (EP);
G01S15/931 (EP);
G01S17/931 (EP);
G01S2013/9314 (EP);
G01S2013/9317 (EP);
G01S2013/9318 (EP);
G01S2013/932 (EP);
G01S2013/9321 (EP);
G01S2013/93271 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/15] |
Former [2009/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Raumauflösendes Fahrerassistenzsystem | [2009/16] | English: | Spatial resolution driver assist system | [2009/16] | French: | Système d'assistance du conducteur à résolution spatiale | [2009/16] | Examination procedure | 06.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/31] | 17.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/31] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4931930 (SHYU JIA-MING [TW], et al) [X] 1,3-7,11 * abstract * * column 2, line 25 - column 7, line 2 *; | [X]GB2374228 (INSTRO PREC LTD [GB]) [X] 1,8,9,11 * abstract * * page 5, line 15 - page 6, line 31 *; | [X]WO2005033736 (VALEO SCHALTER & SENSOREN GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,10,11 * page 5, paragraph L - page 9; figures 1-4; claim 6 *; | [A]DE102005049159 (SICK AG [DE]) [A] 1,2,6-8,11* paragraphs [0016] , [0023] , [0040] , [0041] *; | [X]DE102005032095 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [X]DE102005061718 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,4-7,11 * the whole document * |