EP2026472 - Method and apparatus for adaptive carrier allocation and power control in multi-carrier communication systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.05.2015 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.06.2015 [2015/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adaptix, Inc. 2400 Dallas Parkway, Suite 200 Plano, TX 75093 / US | [2013/42] |
Former [2011/26] | For all designated states Adaptix, Inc. 4100 Midway Road, Suite 2010 Carrollton, TX 75007 / US | ||
Former [2009/08] | For all designated states Adaptix, Inc. 3855 Monte Villa Parkway Suite 150 Bothell, WA 98021 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meiyappan, Palaniappan 2905 160th Place NE Bellevue, WA 98008 / US | [2009/08] | Representative(s) | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/33] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forresters Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/08] | Moore, Joanne Camilla Schweiger & Partner Karlstraße 35 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08105483.5 | 07.11.2002 | [2009/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2026472 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04L27/26 | [2013/20] | CPC: |
H04W52/42 (EP,US);
H04L5/0037 (EP,KR,US);
H04B17/364 (KR);
H04L5/0044 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/006 (EP,KR,US);
H04W36/16 (EP,US);
H04W52/146 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/242 (KR);
H04W52/283 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/367 (EP,US);
H04W72/0473 (KR);
H04L5/0007 (EP,US);
H04W52/16 (EP,US);
H04W52/24 (EP,US);
H04W52/248 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/08] | H04B1/00, H04B1/10, H04L5/02, H04B7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2009/08] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur adaptiven Trägerzuweisung und Leistungssteuerung in Mehrträgerkommunikationssystemen | [2014/31] | English: | Method and apparatus for adaptive carrier allocation and power control in multi-carrier communication systems | [2009/08] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour l'attribution de support adaptatif et contrôle de puissance dans des systèmes de communication multi-porteur | [2009/08] |
Former [2009/08] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Anpassungsträgerzuteilung und Leistungssteuerung in Mehrträgerkommunikationssystemen | Examination procedure | 21.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/36] | 31.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/23] | 13.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/23] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02808132.1 / EP1559281 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020808132) is 23.08.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2014 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9815153 (ERICSSON GE MOBILE INC [US]) [X] 1-11 * abstract * * page 3, line 20 - page 4, line 15 * * page 6, lines 10-15 * * page 8, line 19 - page 11, line 25 *; | [A]EP0946070 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] - [0004] - [0010] , [0081] , [0082]; figures 10a,10b *; | [A]EP1094644 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0005] - [0014] - [0019] , [0034] - [0037] - [0042] , [0043] , [0067] , [0068] *; | [A]EP1185019 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,5 * abstract ** paragraphs [0005] , [0016] , [0017] *; | [XA] - KERPEZ K J, "The channel capacity of hybrid fiber/coax (HFC) networks", INFORMATION THEORY, 1995. PROCEEDINGS., 1995 IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON WHISTLER, BC, CANADA 17-22 SEPT. 1995, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19950917), ISBN 0-7803-2453-6, page 481, XP010192368 [X] 1,5 * column 1, lines 6,7,42-50 * * column 2, lines 4,5 * [A] 2-4,6-11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISIT.1995.550468 | [XA] - WALDECK T ET AL, "Telecommunication applications over the low voltage power distribution grid", SPREAD SPECTRUM TECHNIQUES AND APPLICATIONS, 1998. PROCEEDINGS., 1998 IEEE 5TH INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON SUN CITY, SOUTH AFRICA 2-4 SEPT. 1998, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19980902), vol. 1, ISBN 0-7803-4281-X, pages 73 - 77, XP010307710 [X] 1,5 * Section 2, last paragraph Sections 3.1 Section 4 * [A] 2-4,6-11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISSSTA.1998.726199 | [A] - GOURGUE F ED - INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, "AIR INTERFACE OF THE FUTURE EUROPEAN FULLY DIGITAL TRUNK RADIO SYSTEM", PERSONAL COMMUNICATION - FREEDOM THROUGH WIRELESS TECHNOLOGY. SECAUCUS, NJ., MAY 18 - 20, 1993; [PROCEEDINGS OF THE VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE], NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19930518), vol. CONF. 43, ISBN 978-0-7803-1267-8, pages 714 - 717, XP000393282 [A] 1-11 * page 715 * |