EP2075778 - Danger warning device, procedure and use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2011 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH C/IPE Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2009/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moennich, Joerg Ebertplatz 2 01159 Dresden / DE | 02 /
Schaaf, Gunther Stuttgarter Strasse 121/1 70806 Kornwestheim / DE | 03 /
Haug, Matthias Leobener Strasse 21 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2009/27] | Application number, filing date | 08105669.9 | 27.10.2008 | [2009/27] | Priority number, date | DE20071062709 | 27.12.2007 Original published format: DE102007062709 | [2009/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2075778 | Date: | 01.07.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/27] | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/0967 | [2009/27] | CPC: |
G08G1/096783 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Gefahrenwarneinrichtung sowie Verfahren und Verwendung | [2009/27] | English: | Danger warning device, procedure and use | [2009/27] | French: | Dispositif d'alerte des dangers, ainsi que procédé et utilisation | [2009/27] | Examination procedure | 03.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/44] | 09.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/44] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | DE10248968 | EP1422678 |