EP2060471 - Transport trolley [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.12.2010 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.01.2011 [2011/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wanzl Metallwarenfabrik GmbH Postfach 11 29 89336 Leipheim / DE | [2009/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boxler, Anton Rosenstrasse 16 87772 Pfaffenhausen / DE | 02 /
Wagner, Christian Oberes Mühlfeld 1 87757 Kirchheim / DE | [2009/21] | Application number, filing date | 08105780.4 | 12.11.2008 | [2009/21] | Priority number, date | DE20071055072 | 16.11.2007 Original published format: DE102007055072 | [2009/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2060471 | Date: | 20.05.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2060471 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | [2009/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B62B3/10, B62B3/14 | [2009/21] | CPC: |
B62B3/14 (EP);
B62B3/102 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/32] |
Former [2009/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Transportwagen | [2009/21] | English: | Transport trolley | [2009/21] | French: | Chariot de transport | [2009/21] | Examination procedure | 04.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/01] | 22.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/01] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0591964 (WANZL ENTWICKLUNG GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-6 * column 1, line 57 - column 4, line 9; figure 1 * [Y] 7; | [X]FR2562019 (BOITEAU CHRISTIAN [FR]) [X] 1-6 * figures 1-3; claim - *; | [X]DE6809890U (BELLERICH JOSEF [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,6 * figures 1,2; claim - *; | [DX]US4679805 (CUNNINGHAM MICHAEL J [CA]) [DX] 1,2,4-6 * abstract *; | [Y]GB2422881 (LAN RED [TW]) [Y] 7 * abstract * | by applicant | US4679805 | US3224787 | EP1104376 |