EP2196272 - Casting piece and method for manufacturing a casting piece [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/24] | Casting mould and method for manufacturing a casting mould | ||
[2011/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.2013 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nemak Linz GmbH Zeppelinstrasse 24 4030 Linz / AT | [2010/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aichberger, Thomas Holzwinden 24 4221 Steyregg / AT | [2011/49] |
Former [2010/24] | 01 /
Aichberger, Thomas Holzwinden 24 4221, Steyregg / AT | Representative(s) | Simons, Johannes, et al Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/24] | Simons, Johannes, et al COHAUSZ & FLORACK Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 08105928.9 | 03.12.2008 | [2010/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2196272 | Date: | 16.06.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2196272 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B22C23/00, B22D17/22, B22D19/00 | [2010/24] | CPC: |
B22C23/00 (EP);
B22D17/2245 (EP);
B22D19/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/24] | Title | German: | Gusskörper und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Gusskörpers | [2010/24] | English: | Casting piece and method for manufacturing a casting piece | [2011/44] | French: | Corps coulé et procédé de fabrication d'un corps coulé | [2010/24] |
Former [2010/24] | Casting mould and method for manufacturing a casting mould | Examination procedure | 19.03.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/24] | 14.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.11.2011 | Opposition(s) | 28.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 25.04.2012 | DK | 25.04.2012 | EE | 25.04.2012 | FI | 25.04.2012 | HR | 25.04.2012 | LT | 25.04.2012 | LV | 25.04.2012 | MT | 25.04.2012 | NL | 25.04.2012 | SE | 25.04.2012 | SI | 25.04.2012 | NO | 25.07.2012 | GR | 26.07.2012 | IS | 25.08.2012 | PT | 27.08.2012 | GB | 03.12.2012 | IE | 03.12.2012 | LU | 03.12.2012 | BE | 31.12.2012 | CH | 31.12.2012 | LI | 31.12.2012 | MC | 31.12.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2013/51] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
MT | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
GB | 03.12.2012 | ||
IE | 03.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/48] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
IE | 03.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
IE | 03.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/44] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 25.04.2012 | |
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 25.04.2012 | |
NO | 25.07.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0475761 (TOTO LTD, et al) [A] 16* abstract *; | [X]EP0363791 (ALUMINUM CO OF AMERICA [US]) [X] 1,3,5,6,8,10,11 * figure -; claim - * | by applicant | JPH0475761 | EP0363791 |