EP2072961 - Sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.03.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SICK AG Erwin-Sick-Strasse 1 79183 Waldkirch / DE | [2009/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baak, Josef Dettenbachstrasse 22 79183, Waldkirch / DE | [2009/26] | Representative(s) | Ludewigt, Christoph Sick AG Intellectual Property Erwin-Sick-Strasse 1 79183 Waldkirch / DE | [2013/20] |
Former [2009/26] | Ludewigt, Christoph Sick AG Patentabteilung Erwin-Sick-Strasse 1 79183 Waldkirch / DE | Application number, filing date | 08105989.1 | 16.12.2008 | [2009/26] | Priority number, date | DE20071062911 | 21.12.2007 Original published format: DE102007062911 | [2009/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2072961 | Date: | 24.06.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2072961 | Date: | 15.05.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/20 | [2009/26] | CPC: |
G01D5/2033 (EP);
G01D5/145 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/26] | Title | German: | Sensor | [2009/26] | English: | Sensor | [2009/26] | French: | Capteur | [2009/26] | Examination procedure | 19.11.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.11.2009 | Examination requested [2009/53] | 26.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 18.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.12.2008 | CY | 15.05.2013 | CZ | 15.05.2013 | DK | 15.05.2013 | EE | 15.05.2013 | FI | 15.05.2013 | HR | 15.05.2013 | IT | 15.05.2013 | LT | 15.05.2013 | LV | 15.05.2013 | MC | 15.05.2013 | MT | 15.05.2013 | NL | 15.05.2013 | PL | 15.05.2013 | RO | 15.05.2013 | SE | 15.05.2013 | SI | 15.05.2013 | SK | 15.05.2013 | TR | 15.05.2013 | BG | 15.08.2013 | NO | 15.08.2013 | GR | 16.08.2013 | ES | 26.08.2013 | IS | 15.09.2013 | PT | 16.09.2013 | AT | 16.12.2013 | GB | 16.12.2013 | IE | 16.12.2013 | LU | 16.12.2013 | BE | 31.12.2013 | FR | 31.12.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 16.12.2008 | |
CY | 15.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
IT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
TR | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
AT | 16.12.2013 | ||
GB | 16.12.2013 | ||
IE | 16.12.2013 | ||
LU | 16.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
FR | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 15.05.2013 | |
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
IT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
TR | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
AT | 16.12.2013 | ||
GB | 16.12.2013 | ||
IE | 16.12.2013 | ||
LU | 16.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
FR | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 15.05.2013 | |
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
IT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
AT | 16.12.2013 | ||
GB | 16.12.2013 | ||
IE | 16.12.2013 | ||
LU | 16.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
FR | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/25] | CZ | 15.05.2013 | |
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
IT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
AT | 16.12.2013 | ||
GB | 16.12.2013 | ||
IE | 16.12.2013 | ||
LU | 16.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
FR | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/51] | CZ | 15.05.2013 | |
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
IT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
GB | 16.12.2013 | ||
IE | 16.12.2013 | ||
LU | 16.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
FR | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CZ | 15.05.2013 | |
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
IT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
IE | 16.12.2013 | ||
LU | 16.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/46] | CZ | 15.05.2013 | |
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
IT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
LU | 16.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/38] | CZ | 15.05.2013 | |
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
IT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
LU | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CZ | 15.05.2013 | |
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
IT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CZ | 15.05.2013 | |
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
IT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CZ | 15.05.2013 | |
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | DK | 15.05.2013 | |
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | FI | 15.05.2013 | |
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | FI | 15.05.2013 | |
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 15.05.2013 | |
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 15.05.2013 | |
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | LT | 15.05.2013 | |
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 15.05.2013 | |
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE10013525 (FESTO AG & CO [DE]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraphs [0024] , [0025] * | Examination | DE102004013423 | DE102005015948 | by applicant | DE102006008157 | DE10013525 |