EP1943918 - Method and device for milling wax models [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.06.2009 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delft Spline Systems Vogelsanglaan 29-30 3571 ZM Utrecht / NL | [2008/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lennings, Alexander Frederik Vogelsanglaan 29-30 3571 ZM Utrecht / NL | [2008/29] | Representative(s) | Klavers, Cornelis Octrooibureau Klavers B.V. Markerkant 1201.20 1314 AJ Almere / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Klavers, Cornelis Octrooibureau Klavers B.V. Markerkant 1201.20 1314 AJ Almere / NL | Application number, filing date | 08150045.6 | 04.01.2008 | [2008/29] | Priority number, date | NL20071033220 | 12.01.2007 Original published format: NL 1033220 | [2008/29] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1943918 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A44C27/00, B23Q3/02, B23Q3/06, B23Q3/12 | [2008/29] | CPC: |
A44C27/00 (EP,US);
Y10T83/173 (EP,US);
Y10T83/178 (EP,US);
Y10T83/875 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/13] |
Former [2008/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Fräsung von Wachsmodellen | [2008/29] | English: | Method and device for milling wax models | [2008/29] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de broyage de modèles de cire | [2008/29] | Examination procedure | 17.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/29] | 24.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/29] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2006213048 (KALANOVIC VOJISLAV [US]) [X] 1-16 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0004] , [0016] , [0029] , [0082] - [0084] - [0091] , [0107] , [0117] , [0124] , [0138]; figures 1,3,15,19 *; | [X]US3245678 (RIEHLE HANK F) [X] 1-5,7-14 * column 1, lines 4-16; figure - * * column 1, lines 28-37 * * column 2, lines 29-47 *; | [X]US4822014 (BUCHLER RENE [CH]) [X] 1-5,7-14 * column 1, lines 10-29; figures 5,19 * * column 4, lines 53-62 *; | [X]NL7501250 (MAUSER SCHAERER GMBH) [X] 1-5,7-14 * page 11, line 10 - page 12, line 2; figure 1 *; | [XA]WO03006202 (L H THOMSON COMPANY INC [US], et al) [X] 8-14 * page 4, lines 15-24; figure 1 * [A] 1-5,7; | [X]US3352019 (HARDY PETER S) [X] 8-14 * column 1, lines 10-34; figure - * |