EP1953551 - Prion protein ligands and methods of use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.12.2014 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pathogen Removal and Diagnostic Technologies, Inc. 1 Rodney Square Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | For all designated states NORTH CAROLINA STATE UNIVERSITY 2401 Research Drive, Suite 1122, Campus Box 8210 Raleigh, NC 27695-8210 / US | [2008/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hammond, David 4916m Ripplemead Court Laytonsville, MD 20882 / US | 02 /
Lathrop, Julia T. 1000 Poplar Drive Falls Church, VA 22046 / US | 03 /
Cervenakova, Larisa 15 Welwyn Way Rockville, MD 20850 / US | 04 /
Carbonell, Ruben G. 6105 Godfrey Drive Raleigh, NC 27612 / US | [2008/32] | Representative(s) | Adamson Jones Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/08] | Adamson Jones BioCity Nottingham Pennyfoot Street Nottingham Nottinghamshire NG1 1GF / GB | ||
Former [2009/27] | Adamson Jones BioCity Nottingham Pennyfoot Street Nottingham NG1 1GF / GB | ||
Former [2008/34] | Hutter, Anton, et al AdamsonJones BioCity Nottingham Pennyfoot Street Nottingham NG1 1GF / GB | ||
Former [2008/32] | Hutter, Anton, et al Adamson Jones BioCity Nottingham Pennyfoot Street Nottingham Nottinghamshire NG1 1GF / GB | Application number, filing date | 08150151.2 | 03.12.2003 | [2008/32] | Priority number, date | US20020430423P | 03.12.2002 Original published format: US 430423 P | [2008/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1953551 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1953551 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | [2009/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1953551 | Date: | 19.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07K5/083, C07K5/087, C07K5/093, C07K5/097, C07K14/47, G01N33/68 | [2013/24] | CPC: |
G01N33/6896 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
C07K14/47 (EP,US);
C07K5/0808 (EP,US);
C07K5/081 (EP,US);
C07K5/0812 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/13] | G01N33/53, G01N33/543, G01N33/567, C07K16/00, A61K39/395, G01N33/68 | ||
Former IPC [2008/32] | G01N33/53, G01N33/543, G01N33/567, C07K16/00, A61K39/395 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/32] | Title | German: | Prionen-Protein-Liganden und Verfahren zu deren Verwendung | [2008/32] | English: | Prion protein ligands and methods of use | [2008/32] | French: | Ligands de protéine de prion et procédés d'utilisation | [2008/32] | Examination procedure | 15.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/43] | 09.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03808431.5 / EP1573323 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030808431) is 17.07.2007 | Opposition(s) | 20.11.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2012 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   24.04.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.12.2003 | BG | 19.02.2014 | CY | 19.02.2014 | CZ | 19.02.2014 | EE | 19.02.2014 | MC | 19.02.2014 | RO | 19.02.2014 | SI | 19.02.2014 | SK | 19.02.2014 | [2016/32] |
Former [2016/27] | BG | 19.02.2014 | |
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
MC | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
SI | 19.02.2014 | ||
SK | 19.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | BG | 19.02.2014 | |
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
SI | 19.02.2014 | ||
SK | 19.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 19.02.2014 | |
CZ | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
SI | 19.02.2014 | ||
SK | 19.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 19.02.2014 | |
CZ | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
SK | 19.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 19.02.2014 | |
CZ | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 19.02.2014 | |
CZ | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 19.02.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]WO0177687 (VI TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [DA] 1-14 * page 8, line 25 - line 30 * * page 14, line 20 - page 16, line 18 ** claims 27-29,40,41,45-47 *; | [X]WO0181367 (UNIV GENEVE [CH], et al) [X] 1-3,13,14 * example 4 *; | [X] - KOBAYASHI I ET AL, "RELATIVE RATES OF MONO IODO TYROSINE AND DI IODO TYROSINE LIBERATION DURING ENZYMATIC HYDROLYSIS OF IODINATED DI PEPTIDES AND TRI PEPTIDES", ENDOCRINOLOGY, (1973), vol. 92, no. 6, ISSN 0013-7227, pages 1612 - 1616, XP009111373 [X] 1-3,13,14 * page 1612, column L, paragraph 2 - column R, paragraph 3 * | by applicant | US5750361 | US5808011 | US5834318 | WO0177687 | - INGROSSO, L. ET AL., "Congo red prolongs the incubation period in scrapie-infected hamsters", J. VIROLOGY, (1995), vol. 69, pages 506 - 508 | - TAGLIAVINI, F. ET AL., "Effectiveness of anthracycline against experimental prion diseases in Syrian hamsters", SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 276, doi:doi:10.1126/science.276.5315.1119, pages 1119 - 1122, XP002043060 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.276.5315.1119 | - PRIOLA, S.A. ET AL., "Porphyrin and Phthalocyanine antiscrapie compounds", SCIENCE, (2000), vol. 287, pages 1503 - 1506 | - STOCKEL ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1998), vol. 37, pages 7185 - 7193 | - SOTO, C. ET AL., "Reversion of prion protein conformational changes in synthetic -sheet breaker peptides", LANCET, (2000), vol. 355, doi:doi:10.1016/S0140-6736(99)11419-3, pages 192 - 197, XP004813317 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(99)11419-3 | - CAUGHEY, B. ET AL., "Binding of the Protease-sensitive form of prion protein PrP to Sulphated Glycosaminoglycan and Congo Red", J. VIROLOGY, (1994), vol. 68, pages 2135 - 2141, XP002056076 | - KASCSAK, R.J. ET AL., "Immunodiagnosis of prion disease", IMMUNOLOGICAL INVEST., (1997), vol. 26, doi:doi:10.3109/08820139709048931, pages 259 - 268, XP002916122 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3109/08820139709048931 | - FISCHER, M.B. ET AL., "Binding of disease-associated prion protein to plasminogen", NATURE, (2000), vol. 408, doi:doi:10.1038/35044100, pages 479 - 483, XP002520611 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/35044100 | - SMITH; WATERMAN, ADV. APPL. MATH., (1981), vol. 2, page 482 | - NEEDLEMAN; WUNSCH, J. MOL. BIOL., (1970), vol. 48, page 443 | - PEARSON; LIPMAN, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1988), vol. 85, page 2444 | - MERRIFIELD, SCIENCE, (1986), vol. 232, pages 241 - 247 | - JAMESON ET AL., NATURE, (1994), vol. 368, pages 744 - 746 | - SAMSON ET AL., ENDOCRINOLOGY, (1996), vol. 137, pages 5182 - 5185 | - DEGRADO, ADV. PROTEIN CHEM., (1988), vol. 39, pages 51 - 124 | - ROSE ET AL., ADV. PROTEIN CHEM., (1985), vol. 37, pages 1 - 109 | - AUBRY ET AL., INT. J. PEPT. PROTEIN RES., (1981), vol. 18, pages 195 - 202 | - SAFIR, J. ET AL., "Eight Prion Strains Have PrPsc Molecules With Different Conformations", NATURE MEDICINE, (1998), vol. 4, pages 1157 - 1165 |