EP2067935 - Method of energy optimisation on a site including cogeneration and a thermal power station [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.09.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIÉTÉ ANONYME POUR L'ÉTUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCÉDÉS GEORGES CLAUDE 75 Quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | [2021/13] |
Former [2021/10] | For all designated states L'Air Liquide Société Anon. à Directoire et Conseil de Surveillance pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75 Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2009/24] | For all designated states L'Air Liquide Société Anon. à Directoire et Conseil de Surveillance pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75 Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Poline, Tanguy 5 rue du Clos de Ville 94370, Sucy en Brie / FR | [2009/24] | Representative(s) | Air Liquide L'Air Liquide S.A. Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2021/10] |
Former [2009/24] | Conan, Philippe Claude L'Air Liquide Direction de la Propriété Industrielle 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 08150553.9 | 23.01.2008 | [2009/24] | Priority number, date | FR20070052875 | 25.01.2007 Original published format: FR 0752875 | [2009/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2067935 | Date: | 10.06.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2067935 | Date: | 19.06.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2067935 | Date: | 10.03.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/10] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2067935 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | [2021/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F01K13/00, F01K23/06, F01K23/10, F01K23/08 | [2009/24] | CPC: |
F01K13/006 (EP,US);
F01K23/06 (EP,US);
F01K23/08 (EP,US);
Y02E20/14 (EP,US);
Y02P80/15 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2021/10] |
Former [2009/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur energetischen Optimierung eines Standorts, der ein Blockheizkraftwerk und ein Wärmekraftwerk umfasst | [2009/24] | English: | Method of energy optimisation on a site including cogeneration and a thermal power station | [2009/24] | French: | Procédé d'optimisation énergétique d'un site comprenant une cogénération et une centrale thermique | [2020/44] |
Former [2009/24] | Procédé d'optimisation énergétique d'un site comprenant une cogénéraltion et une centrale thermique | Examination procedure | 11.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/06] | 14.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.01.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.06.2017 | Opposition(s) | 13.12.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 25.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.01.2008 | AT | 10.03.2021 | CY | 10.03.2021 | CZ | 10.03.2021 | DK | 10.03.2021 | EE | 10.03.2021 | ES | 10.03.2021 | FI | 10.03.2021 | HR | 10.03.2021 | IT | 10.03.2021 | LT | 10.03.2021 | LV | 10.03.2021 | MC | 10.03.2021 | MT | 10.03.2021 | PL | 10.03.2021 | RO | 10.03.2021 | SE | 10.03.2021 | SI | 10.03.2021 | SK | 10.03.2021 | TR | 10.03.2021 | BG | 10.06.2021 | NO | 10.06.2021 | GR | 11.06.2021 | IS | 10.07.2021 | PT | 12.07.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 23.01.2008 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CY | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
TR | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 23.01.2008 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CY | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 23.01.2008 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4555906 (MARTENS ALAN [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * column 3, line 46 - column 11, line 2; figure -; claim - * * abstract *; | [A]US4819436 (AHNER DAVID J [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * column 3, line 4 - column 5, line 45; figure -; claim - ** abstract *; | [X]US4961311 (PAVEL JAMES [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 3, line 26 - column 5, line 61; figure .; claim - * * abstract *; | [A]JPH06257413 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]WO9636792 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-3 * page 4, line 24 - page 7, line 25; figure -; claim - * * abstract * |